WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. COCHRAN
Plaintiff: READING HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as READING HOSPITAL, ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL doing business as SWEDISH HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, LORETTO HOSPITAL, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL and WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00327
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NORRIS COCHRAN served on 2/19/2021 (Ruskin, Andrew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/19/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/20/2021. (Ruskin, Andrew)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/19/2021. (Ruskin, Andrew)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NORRIS COCHRAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
February 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-190. (Ruskin, Andrew)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, LORETTO HOSPITAL, MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, READING HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL, SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Ruskin, Andrew)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORRIS COCHRAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8168881) filed by MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, LORETTO HOSPITAL, THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, READING HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL, WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Remand (PRRB Case 14-1574G), #2 Exhibit Exhbiit 2 - Remand (PRRB Case 14-3330G), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Remand (PRRB Case 14-3335G), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Remand (PRRB Case 15-0348G), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Board Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons to Cochran, #8 Summons to Sherwin, #9 Summons to Wilkinson)(Ruskin, Andrew)
February 5, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to andrew.ruskin@klgates.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al v. COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: READING HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as READING HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. ANTHONY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOREK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWEDISH COVENANT HOSPITAL doing business as SWEDISH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORETTO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATAUGA MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Andrew David Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORRIS COCHRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?