GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORTATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00345
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda)
March 29, 2021 Filing 29 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 29, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda)
March 29, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly)
March 25, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Wray, Ron)
March 17, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Bradley on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Bradley, Amanda)
February 27, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Gant on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Gant, Scott)
February 26, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank M. Lowrey, IV on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Lowrey, Frank)
February 26, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiana S. Mykkeltvedt on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Mykkeltvedt, Tiana)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CSX TRANSPORTATION waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/11/2021. (Mykkeltvedt, Tiana)
February 16, 2021 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Collette, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY.(Collette, Matthew)
February 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Collette, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00333. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-14 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to USDC District of Columbia for inclusion in MDL 2925. (tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James Michael Grippando. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James P. Denvir. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Scott E. Gant. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Stuart H. Singer. Clerk to follow-up by 2/16/2021. (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. BNSF Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver mailed on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/24/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/22/2021. (tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The General Electric Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10627975) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Ron Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Linda Sue Stein
Represented By: Molly Bruder Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: James P. Denvir
Represented By: Scott E. Gant
Represented By: James Michael Grippando
Represented By: Frank M. Lowrey, IV
Represented By: Amanda Bradley
Represented By: Tiana S. Mykkeltvedt
Represented By: James Peter Denvir, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?