GATLIN v. UNITY HEALTHCARE
Plaintiff: MICHEAL GATLIN
Defendant: UNITY HEALTHCARE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00432
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by April 12, 2021, to Defendant Unity Healthcare's #9 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/19/2021. (lcapm2)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITY HEALTHCARE. re #9 MOTION to Substitute Party MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITY HEALTHCARE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zeg)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITY HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(eg)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The medical records included as Attachment 1 and Attachment 2 to the Torres Declaration, as well as Defendant's Memorandum of Law, shall be sealed. It is further ordered that Defendant shall file a public, redacted version of its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 11, 2021. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/15/2021. (lcapm2) Modified on 3/16/2021 (lcapm2).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 the United States' motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint. The United States' response to the Complaint shall be extended, nunc pro tunc, until March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/15/2021. (lcapm2)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITY HEALTHCARE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order regarding sealing, #2 Motion, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Statement of Facts, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, Nunc Pro Tunc by UNITY HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by UNITY HEALTHCARE (Valdivia, Diana)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of All Defendants (Valdivia, Diana)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States removed this matter to this court on February 18, 2021. ECF No. #1 . The United States' response to the complaint therefore appears to have been due on February 25, 2021. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2)(C). The United States has not yet filed its response. It shall do so by March 12, 2021, or risk entry of default. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/5/2021. (lcapm2)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (adh, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UNITY HEALTHCARE filed by UNITY HEALTHCARE.(Valdivia, Diana) .
February 19, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to diana.valdivia@usdoj.gov, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
February 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003879 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITY HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valdivia, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GATLIN v. UNITY HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHEAL GATLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITY HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Diana Viggiano Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?