FRENKEL v. THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: ROBERT FRENKEL
Defendant: THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY and GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00453
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT FRENKEL (Acin, Alfredo)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by ROBERT FRENKEL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Acin, Alfredo)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Baron on behalf of GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY (Baron, Stephanie)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendant's #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 03/29/2021. (lcrjl3)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. I tis further ORDERED that defendant shall file its Answer or other responsive pleading on or before April 23, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/23/21. (lcrjl1)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephanie K. Baron, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8314149. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Pontone on behalf of All Defendants (Pontone, Kathleen) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/19/2021) (zjf).
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hodge-Wren, Sasha)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
February 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8226592) filed by ROBERT FRENKEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Summons)(Acin, Alfredo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRENKEL v. THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FRENKEL
Represented By: Alfredo Acin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Stephanie Baron
Represented By: Sasha E. Hodge-Wren
Represented By: Kathleen Pontone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?