WILLIAMSON v. C. R. BARD INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: SHARICA WRIGHT and SHARICA WILLIAMSON
Defendant: C. R. BARD INCORPORATED and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2021cv00510
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven B. Rotman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8396181. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SHARICA WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven B. Rotman in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Lewis, Richard)
April 12, 2021 NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Lewis on behalf of SHARICA WRIGHT (Lewis, Richard). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/19/2021. (znmw)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Lewis on behalf of SHARICA WRIGHT (Lewis, Richard)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Ryf on behalf of SHARICA WRIGHT (Ryf, Colleen)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Plaintiff to act within 30 days or risk dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or entry of default. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the following address: Matthew Lopez, 100 Bayview Circle, Suite 5600, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/12/21. (lctjk2)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/12/21. (lctjk2)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C. R. BARD INCORPORATED. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (Busman, Philip)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Busman on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C. R. BARD INCORPORATED (Busman, Philip)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-04115. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Columbia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/3/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/3/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/3/2021.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-4115-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/3/2021.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13655817 filed by Sharica Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMSON v. C. R. BARD INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARICA WRIGHT
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Represented By: Colleen Ryf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARICA WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Richard S. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. BARD INCORPORATED
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Busman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?