GONSALVES v. ROSENWORCEL et al
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD GONSALVES
Defendant: FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, JESSICA ROSENWORCEL, CHRIS ANDERSON, PAUL BLAIS and JUSTIN CAIN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00556
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/18/2021. (lcrdm2)
April 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
April 12, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number: 4616105376. (zsb)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/09/2021. (zsb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CLIFFORD GONSALVES. (zsb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHRIS ANDERSON, PAUL BLAIS, JUSTIN CAIN, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, JESSICA ROSENWORCEL with Jury Demand filed by CLIFFORD GONSALVES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(zsb)
March 2, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/02/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONSALVES v. ROSENWORCEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA ROSENWORCEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL BLAIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN CAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD GONSALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?