SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC. v. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE et al
Plaintiff: SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC.
Defendant: JOHN P ROTH, DANIEL R HOKANSON, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, DANIEL R. HOKANSON and JOHN P. ROTH
Case Number: 1:2021cv00634
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Carter on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Ashley)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Martin Cumming on behalf of DANIEL R. HOKANSON, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, JOHN P. ROTH, UNITED STATES AIR FORCE (Cumming, Gregory)
March 23, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #9 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (ztd)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2021. (Henry, Kathleen)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 3/19/2021. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 4/9/2021. (Henry, Kathleen) Modified on 3/23/2021 (ztd).
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE served on 3/18/2021 (Henry, Kathleen)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/19/2021. (Henry, Kathleen)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DANIEL R. HOKANSON served on 3/17/2021; NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU served on 3/17/2021; JOHN P. ROTH served on 3/18/2021 (Henry, Kathleen)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/19/2021. (DM)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DANIEL R HOKANSON, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, JOHN P ROTH, UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 10, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge John D. Bates is no longer assigned to the case. (adh, )
March 10, 2021 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates.
March 10, 2021 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC.. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1086. (Henry, Kathleen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC. (Henry, Kathleen)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8292002) filed by SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons SUMMONS JOHN ROTH ACTING SECRETARY OF THE AIR FORCE, #3 Summons SUMMONS US AIR FORCE, #4 Summons SUMMONS NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, #5 Summons SUMMONS GENERAL DANIEL R HOKANSON, CHIEF, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, #6 Summons SUMMONS US ATTORNEY DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, #7 Summons SUMMONS US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Henry, Kathleen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/19/2021) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC. v. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAFE SKIES CLEAN WATER WISCONSIN, INC.
Represented By: Kathleen Green Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN P ROTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL R HOKANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Represented By: Ashley Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES AIR FORCE
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Represented By: Ashley Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL R. HOKANSON
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Represented By: Ashley Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN P. ROTH
Represented By: Gregory Martin Cumming
Represented By: Ashley Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?