HESS CONSTRUCTION + ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: HESS CONSTRUCTION + ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00712
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #6 ANSWER to Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY.(Wilson, Benjamin).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 5/18/2021. (znmw) Modified on 5/13/2021 (znmw).
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY.(Wilson, Benjamin)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Farinato Webster on behalf of HESS CONSTRUCTION + ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. (Webster, Lucas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Filing Exhibits to Complaint by HESS CONSTRUCTION + ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Campbell, Nicole)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HESS Construction + Engineering Services, Inc. (Campbell, Nicole)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8310296) filed by HESS Construction + Engineering Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Campbell, Nicole)
March 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HESS CONSTRUCTION + ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY
Represented By: Benjamin F. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HESS CONSTRUCTION + ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Nicole Lefcourt Campbell
Represented By: Lucas Farinato Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?