MATTHEWS v. MCDONOUGH
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. MATTHEWS
Defendant: DENIS MCDONOUGH
Case Number: 1:2021cv00760
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 22 U.S.C. ยง 2702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this order to file an amended complaint (1) substituting the United States as defendant, and (2) containing his full residence address, or alternatively, he must file an accompanying motion setting forth reasons to use the P.O. Box address. Plaintiffs failure to correct these errors within the time provided will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 05/14/2021. (zsb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT R. MATTHEWS. (zsb)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT R. MATTHEWS. (zsb)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENIS MCDONOUGH filed by ROBERT R. MATTHEWS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(zsb)
March 22, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/22/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATTHEWS v. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENIS MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?