NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, FRIENDS OF MINNESOTA SCIENTIFIC AND NATURAL AREAS and NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and MARTHA WILLIAMS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00770
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hsieh on behalf of FRIENDS OF MINNESOTA SCIENTIFIC AND NATURAL AREAS, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. (Hsieh, Margaret)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Spatz on behalf of All Defendants (Spatz, Michelle)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/19/2021. (Rhoads, Lucas)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/31/2021. (Rhoads, Lucas) Modified on 5/2/2021 to correct service date (zjf).
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 4/19/2021; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 4/5/2021; MARTHA WILLIAMS served on 4/5/2021 (Rhoads, Lucas)
April 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct. Service was executed upon U.S. Attorney (zjf)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/20/2021. (Rhoads, Lucas) Modified on 4/29/2021 (zjf).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave of Margaret Hsieh to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/1/21. (DMK)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Margaret Hsieh, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8331064. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Margaret Hsieh, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhoads, Lucas)
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Shannon, Ryan)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FRIENDS OF MINNESOTA SCIENTIFIC AND NATURAL AREAS (Rhoads, Lucas)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. (Rhoads, Lucas)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8324786) filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC., FRIENDS OF MINNESOTA SCIENTIFIC AND NATURAL AREAS, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons US Fish and Wildlife Service, #6 Summons Acting Director Martha Williams, #7 Summons Department of the Interior)(Rhoads, Lucas)
March 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC. et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Michelle M. Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Michelle M. Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Michelle M. Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Lucas Jackson Rhoads
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF MINNESOTA SCIENTIFIC AND NATURAL AREAS
Represented By: Lucas Jackson Rhoads
Represented By: Margaret Hsieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, INC.
Represented By: Lucas Jackson Rhoads
Represented By: Margaret Hsieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?