CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE and MARTHA WILLIAMS
Case Number: 1:2021cv00791
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine M. Akland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Akland, Kristine)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 4 Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Kristine M. Akland is hereby admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions.Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/22/2021. (lctjk3) Modified to correct formatting on 4/22/2021 (zkh).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 04/21/2021. (lctjk3)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR served on 4/5/2021; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 4/5/2021; MARTHA WILLIAMS served on 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Atwood, Amy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Atwood, Amy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/6/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/5/2021. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Atwood, Amy); Modified event and text on 4/20/2021 (ztth).
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristine M. Akland, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8348650. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atwood, Amy)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
March 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Atwood, Amy)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8327441) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, #3 Summons to Martha Williams, #4 Summons to Secretary of the Interior, #5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #6 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Atwood, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Amy R. Atwood
Represented By: Kristine M. Akland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?