CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE and MARTHA WILLIAMS
Petitioner: WESTLANDS WATER DISTRICT
Case Number: 1:2021cv00884
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Intervene filed by WESTLANDS WATER DISTRICT. (Ginsberg, Beth)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Merissa A. Moeller is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/25/21. (lcegs3)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. David E. Filippi is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/21/2021. (lcegs3)
May 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 7/26/2021. (mac)
May 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Merissa A. Moeller, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8467720. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESTLANDS WATER DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Merissa A. Moeller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ginsberg, Beth)
May 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David E. Filippi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8467715. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WESTLANDS WATER DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Filippi, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ginsberg, Beth)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than July 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/20/2021. (lcegs3)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayhall, Taylor)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Intervene filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shannon, Ryan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Intervene filed by SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayhall, Taylor)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Westlands Water District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Beth S. Ginsberg, #2 Declaration of Jose Gutierrez, #3 Proposed Answer, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ginsberg, Beth)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Answer or Responsive Pleading Date by SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Mayhall, Taylor)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Mayhall on behalf of SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS (Mayhall, Taylor)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/21/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Shannon, Ryan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Shannon, Ryan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR served on 4/9/2021; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 4/9/2021; MARTHA WILLIAMS served on 4/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Shannon, Ryan)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/02/21. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
April 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (znmg)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Shannon, Ryan)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-00573-EGS; 20-cv-00146-EGS; 19-cv-01071-EGS; 10-cv-00230-EGS; 10-mc-00377-EGS. (Shannon, Ryan)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8343541) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shannon, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Taylor Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Taylor Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Taylor Mayhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WESTLANDS WATER DISTRICT
Represented By: Beth S. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?