COWAN v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATION COMMISSION
Plaintiff: SUSAN WILSON COWAN
Defendant: FEDERAL COMMUNICATION COMMISSION
Case Number: 1:2021cv00895
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/5/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2021. (Belendiuk, Arthur)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (zjf)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US Attorney filed by SUSAN WILSON COWAN.(Belendiuk, Arthur)
April 28, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading and select the correct event. There is no proof of service as to the U.S Attorney only as to the Federal Defendant and U.S. Attorney General. (zjf)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/22/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/22/2021. (Belendiuk, Arthur) Modified on 4/28/2021 (zjf).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/02/21. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL COMMUNICATION COMMISSION and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
April 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA by SUSAN WILSON COWAN. (Belendiuk, Arthur) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (adh, ).
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct by SUSAN WILSON COWAN. (Belendiuk, Arthur) Modified on 4/1/2021 (adh, ).
April 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to abelendiuk@fccworld.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Wilson Cowan ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8345181) filed by Susan Wilson Cowan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons FCC, #3 Summons Summons US Attorney)(Belendiuk, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COWAN v. FEDERAL COMMUNICATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL COMMUNICATION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN WILSON COWAN
Represented By: Arthur Vasyl Belendiuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?