LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. MICHELLE COSTABILE et al
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WE HANDLE TRANSPORT, LLC, CLAUST LLC, NINKA TRUCKING CO., LLC, OK TRUCKING LLC, ECLECTIC LOGISTICS, GML FREIGHT, LLC, F.E.C. TRUCKING, LLC, G S TRANSPORT, INC., PROFIT LOGISTIC, INC. D/B/A MP FREIGHT, MICHELLE COSTABILE, MD UNITED, INC., U&B TRANSPORTATION LLC, FMA EXPRESS, LLC, KAHLER TRUCKING, LLC, C R TRANSPORT INC., H P BRAR TRUCKING, INC., TOP GUN LOGISTICS LLC, TAYLOR TRUCKING, LLC, PRO SQUAD LLC, LONE STAR TRUCKING LLC, JUJU'S HOT SHOTS LLC, HAULING HASS TRANSPORT, LLC, DO IT BIG LOGISTICS, LLC, RM TRANSPORTATION INC., KEN'S EXPRESS TRUCKING, INC., MARIA ELENA TRUCKING, LLC, FALCON XPRESS INC., TWIN K CONSTRUCTION, INC., ROADEX SERVICES, LTD., NATIONWIDE TRANSPORTATION LLC, J R G TRANSPORT, INC., LANITA SPECIALIZED, LLC, SA TRUCKING LOGISTICS, INC., ADAMS TRUCKING LLC, WESTERN TRANSPORT LOGISTICS, INC., SILVER TRUCKING LLC, MK BOSS TRANSPORTATION, INC., EARLY BIRD TRANSPORT AND BIG TRUCK DRIVER LLP, SUNDOWN TRUCKLINE, LLC, NOVA LINES, INC., OLIVEIRAS TRANSPORT, LLC, AMERICAN EAGLE ENTERPRISE INC., PROACTIVE EXPRESS, LLC, K JOHNSON TRANSPORTS, LLC, JACMA SERVICES, LLC, JORGE H LOPEZ D/B/A LOPEZ TRUCKING, TITOS SERVICES LLC, ECLECTIC LOGISTICS, LLC, AMERICAN ROAD CARRIER TRANSPORT INC., BEST CHOICE LOGISTICS INC., ERW TRANSPORT LLC, JP GRAHAM TRANSPORT, INC., KATY LOGISTIC GROUP, INC., ARP PAPE TRANSFER INC. D/B/A TUCKER FREIGHT LINES INC., PCB HOTSHOTS, LLC, SUNWAY CARRIERS, INC., YAKUBOV LLC D/B/A US-PENN LOGISTICS, BE ON TIME INC., CAROLINA CUSTOM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS INC., LJ TRANSPORT EXPRESS, LLC, WIZZARD WAY, INC., STINGRAY TRANSPORT LLC, SILVERLINE, LLC, ROANE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC, JORGE H LOPEZ doing business as LOPEZ TRUCKING, ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC., ELITA TRANS CO, ARP PAPE TRANSFER INC. doing business as TUCKER FREIGHT LINES INC. and YAKUBOV LLC doing business as US-PENN LOGISTICS
Case Number: 1:2021cv01048
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:0020
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of SUNWAY CARRIERS, INC. (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of TWIN K CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of ROANE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of OK TRUCKING LLC (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of NINKA TRUCKING CO., LLC (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of MK BOSS TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of MD UNITED, INC. (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of G S TRANSPORT, INC. (Kurz, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as Assignee of United Flat Truck, Inc. and Pro Funding, Inc. by ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Anthony Mangini, #2 Exhibit Proposed Answer of Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc. as Assignee of United Flat Truck, Inc. and Pro Funding, Inc., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoogstraten, Nick)
June 11, 2021 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint by ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC..(Hoogstraten, Nick)
June 11, 2021 Filing 50 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Hoogstraten, Nick)
June 11, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick R. Hoogstraten on behalf of ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Hoogstraten, Nick)
June 11, 2021 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Anthony Mangini, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoogstraten, Nick)
May 27, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE. KATY LOGISTIC GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MARIA ELENA TRUCKING, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 25, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AMERICAN EAGLE ENTERPRISE INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE. J R G TRANSPORT, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 17, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE. NOVA LINES, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 14, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE. PROFIT LOGISTIC, INC. D/B/A MP FREIGHT waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 13, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WIZZARD WAY, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 12, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE. OLIVEIRAS TRANSPORT, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WE HANDLE TRANSPORT, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BE ON TIME INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE. GML FREIGHT, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE. G S TRANSPORT, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ADAMS TRUCKING LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SA TRUCKING LOGISTICS, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE. KEN'S EXPRESS TRUCKING, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE. OK TRUCKING LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JUJU'S HOT SHOTS LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CLAUST LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MK BOSS TRANSPORTATION, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE. RM TRANSPORTATION INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE. F.E.C. TRUCKING, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FMA EXPRESS, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE. EARLY BIRD TRANSPORT AND BIG TRUCK DRIVER LLP waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE. LJ TRANSPORT EXPRESS, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE. YAKUBOV LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE. FALCON XPRESS INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AMERICAN ROAD CARRIER TRANSPORT INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 6, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ARP PAPE TRANSFER INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 4, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ROANE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
May 4, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE. STINGRAY TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ROADEX SERVICES, LTD. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE. U&B TRANSPORTATION LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE. PCB HOTSHOTS, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WESTERN TRANSPORT LOGISTICS, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE. MD UNITED, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE. HAULING HASS TRANSPORT, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ERW TRANSPORT LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TAYLOR TRUCKING, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. KAHLER TRUCKING, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. C R TRANSPORT INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE. LANITA SPECIALIZED, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE. CAROLINA CUSTOM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TOP GUN LOGISTICS LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE. PRO SQUAD LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE. NINKA TRUCKING CO., LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TWIN K CONSTRUCTION, INC. waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (Husk, John)
April 16, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
April 16, 2021 SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants (zsb)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, INDEMNITY AND POSTING OF COLLATERAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8378162) filed by LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-General Agreement of Indemnity, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Husk, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY v. MICHELLE COSTABILE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WE HANDLE TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUST LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NINKA TRUCKING CO., LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK TRUCKING LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECLECTIC LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GML FREIGHT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.E.C. TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G S TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROFIT LOGISTIC, INC. D/B/A MP FREIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE COSTABILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD UNITED, INC.
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U&B TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMA EXPRESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAHLER TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H P BRAR TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOP GUN LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO SQUAD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONE STAR TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUJU'S HOT SHOTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAULING HASS TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO IT BIG LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RM TRANSPORTATION INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN'S EXPRESS TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA ELENA TRUCKING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FALCON XPRESS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWIN K CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROADEX SERVICES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J R G TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANITA SPECIALIZED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA TRUCKING LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAMS TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN TRANSPORT LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVER TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MK BOSS TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARLY BIRD TRANSPORT AND BIG TRUCK DRIVER LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNDOWN TRUCKLINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVA LINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVEIRAS TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN EAGLE ENTERPRISE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROACTIVE EXPRESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K JOHNSON TRANSPORTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACMA SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE H LOPEZ D/B/A LOPEZ TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITOS SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECLECTIC LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ROAD CARRIER TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST CHOICE LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERW TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP GRAHAM TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATY LOGISTIC GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARP PAPE TRANSFER INC. D/B/A TUCKER FREIGHT LINES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCB HOTSHOTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNWAY CARRIERS, INC.
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YAKUBOV LLC D/B/A US-PENN LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BE ON TIME INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLINA CUSTOM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJ TRANSPORT EXPRESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIZZARD WAY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STINGRAY TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVERLINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROANE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE H LOPEZ doing business as LOPEZ TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Nick R. Hoogstraten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELITA TRANS CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARP PAPE TRANSFER INC. doing business as TUCKER FREIGHT LINES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YAKUBOV LLC doing business as US-PENN LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John T. Husk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?