HILL v. SAUL
Plaintiff: KALEA HILL
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv01323
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Referring Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/29/2021. (ztd)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW M. SAUL served on 6/7/2021 (ztd)
June 2, 2021 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for report and recommendations. (adh, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to US Marshal Service. (adh, )
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's complaint, Dkt. #1 , it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerks Office, for purposes of issuing a report and recommendation on the matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 06/02/2021. (lcrdm1)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/28/2021. (adh, )
May 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KALEA HILL. (adh, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL filed by KALEA HILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(adh, )
May 13, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 5/13/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALEA HILL
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?