FENNER v. CARTER
Petitioner: ANTWARN D. FENNER
Respondent: C. CARTER
Case Number: 1:2021cv01335
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause ; Date of Service of show cause order 6/29/2021. (ztth) Modified event on 7/1/2021 (znmw).
June 16, 2021 SHOW CAUSE (1) reissued as to U.S. Attorney pursuant to Order to Show Cause, sent to U.S Marshal Service (adh, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to U.S. Attorney. (ztth) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/15/2021) (ztth).
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/9/2021. (ztth)
June 2, 2021 SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to C. CARTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to #2 Order to Show Cause, sent to US Marshal service. (adh, )
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the respondent to address petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus within 20 days of service; directing the Clerk to promptly serve the petition on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia (see document for details). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/28/2021.(psu1)
May 19, 2021 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number: 4616105607. (ztth); Modified on 5/24/2021 (ztth), duplicate entry.
May 19, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number: 461605607. (ztth)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ANTWARN D. FENNER. (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FENNER v. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTWARN D. FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?