FLAVELL v. MARSHALL et al
Plaintiff: SARA GONZALEZ FLAVELL
Defendant: REED GROUP, LTD and TRACY JANE MARSHALL
Case Number: 1:2021cv01406
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Correction by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD re #12 Memorandum in Opposition, (Camacho, Jeremy)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Further Support of Their Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Camacho, Jeremy) Modified docket event/text on 7/9/2021 (eg).
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Camacho, Jeremy)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by SARA GONZALEZ FLAVELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(eg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by SARA GONZALEZ FLAVELL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(eg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TRACY JANE MARSHALL served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; REED GROUP, LTD served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021 (eg)
June 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2021. (zjch)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER requiring the plaintiff to respond to the defendants' #5 Motion to Dismiss on or before July 1, 2021. See text for details. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff's address of record. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 2, 2021. (lcdlf2)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 Receipt on 6/1/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 001258 B. (eg)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD (Camacho, Jeremy)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Camacho, Jeremy)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 25, 2021. (lcdlf3)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
May 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, and Related Case Form by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Related Case Form)(Camacho, Jeremy)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2021-cv-01258 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8475265 filed by TRACY JANE MARSHALL, REED GROUP, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Exh A. State Court Complaint, #2 Superior Court Documents Exh B. State Court Notice of Service, #3 Superior Court Documents Exh C. State Court Certificate of Fact of Good Standing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camacho, Jeremy)
May 24, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to jcamacho@grsm.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. Missing Related Case form. Please submit using the event Notice of Related Case., 4. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLAVELL v. MARSHALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA GONZALEZ FLAVELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REED GROUP, LTD
Represented By: Jeremy D Camacho, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY JANE MARSHALL
Represented By: Jeremy D Camacho, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?