ROSEN v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ROSEN
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM.CA, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC and AMAZON.COM SALES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01446
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMAZON.COM, INC. (Wharton, Michael) Modified to correct filer and text on 7/6/2021 (ztd).
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM, INC..(Wharton, Michael)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Amazon.com, LLC; Amazon.com Services, LLC; Amazon.com Sales, Inc.; Amazon.com.ca, Inc. Without Prejudice (Brown, Daniel)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/27/2021. (lcrdm2)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to AMAZON.COM SALES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, AMAZON.COM.CA, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8486362) filed by MICHAEL ROSEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brown, Daniel)
May 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (znmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSEN v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ROSEN
Represented By: Daniel A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Michael T. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM.CA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?