UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AON PLC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: AON PLC and WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01633
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jones, William)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's #53 Notice of Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2021. (lcrbw1)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2021. (lcrbw2)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #51 Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling and Case Management Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the status conference previously scheduled for July 21, 2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2021. (lcrbw2)
July 19, 2021 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order and Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, William)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 20, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the government shall produce to the defendants the investigation materials referred to in the parties' #48 Joint Status Report Regarding a Scheduling and Case Management Order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 26, 2021, the government shall respond to the defendants' special interrogatories. The government's responses shall comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 16, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the deadlines for the defendants to propose additional settlement offers for adjudication at trial and for the parties to agree on whether a consent decree will be filed on Counts III through V of the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the government's proposed language regarding Paragraph 25 of the proposed scheduling and case management order shall not be included in the proposed scheduling and case management order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint proposed scheduling and case management order, reflecting the Court's rulings. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall advise the Court in writing as to whether the hearing currently scheduled for July 21, 2021, is necessary to resolve a dispute regarding the deadlines for settlement offers and a consent decree. It is further ORDERED that, on July 21, 2021, at 3:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a security code required to access the status conference. Members of the public are advised to dial in by calling 1-888-273-3658 and entering the public access code (1809972). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 16, 2021. (lcrbw1)
July 15, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference/Oral Argument held on 7/15/2021. A written order will issue from Chambers. Status Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 03:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards) (hs)
July 15, 2021 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on July 15, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-51. Date of Issuance: July 15, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court re porter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2021.(Edwards, Lisa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 48 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding a Scheduling and Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Jones, William)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the parties' #45 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. The attached Protective Order is hereby ENTERED in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 9, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Main Document 47 replaced on 7/19/2021) (zhs).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the #16 Defendants' Motion for Entry of Protective Order and Production of Investigation Materials is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the #34 Defendants' Motion for Expedited Entry of Scheduling Order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the defendants seek the scheduling of trial in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the #36 Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Special Interrogatories is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 12, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer regarding a protective order and a case management order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 13, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall advise the Court in writing as to whether the hearing currently scheduled for July 15, 2021, is necessary to resolve any remaining disputes regarding the proposed protective and case management orders. It is further ORDERED that, on July 15, 2021, at 3:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). It is further ORDERED that the bench trial in this case shall occur from November 18, 2021, to November 23, 2021, and from December 20, 2021, to December 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 9, 2021. (lcrbw1)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a security code required to access the status conference scheduled for July 15, 2021. Members of the public are advised to dial in by calling 1-888-273-3658 and entering the public access code (1809972). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 9, 2021. (lcrbw1)
July 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 7/12/2021. Status Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs)
July 8, 2021 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Williamson, Edward)
July 6, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 7/6/2021. Status Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 03:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC. Bench Trial set for 11/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 - In Person before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zhs)
July 6, 2021 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT OF 7/6/21 MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on July 6, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-37. Date of Issuance: 7/6/2021. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021.(Wayne, Bryan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lynn Tavernia on behalf of AON PLC (Tavernia, Tara)
July 5, 2021 Filing 42 REPLY to opposition to motion re #34 MOTION to Expedite Entry of Scheduling Order filed by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Williamson, Edward)
July 5, 2021 Filing 41 Memorandum in opposition to re #37 MOTION to Compel Response to Special Interrogatories (CORRECTED) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, William)
July 2, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Damian Welsh on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Welsh, Eric)
July 2, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Robinson on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Robinson, Andrew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 38 Memorandum in opposition to re #34 MOTION to Expedite filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William H. Jones II, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, William)
July 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response due by 7/5/2021 (hs)
July 1, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel Response to Special Interrogatories (CORRECTED) by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #2 Exhibit A of Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #3 Exhibit B of Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #4 Exhibit C of Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Edward)
July 1, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Compel Response to Special Interrogatories by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Edward)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional information before resolving the #36 Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Special Interrogatories, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 5, 2021, at 12:00 p.m., the government shall file its opposition, if any, to the defendant's motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 1, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response due by 7/2/2021 (hs)
June 28, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sheerin on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Sheerin, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional information before resolving the #16 Defendants' Motion for Entry of Protective Order and Production of Investigation Materials, it is hereby ORDERED that, on July 6, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a motion hearing, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 28, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 28, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/6/2021 at 02:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional information before resolving the #34 Defendants' Motion for Expedited Entry of Scheduling Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 2, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the government shall file its opposition, if any, to the defendants' motion. It is further ORDERED that the Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a security code required to access the motion hearing scheduled for July 6, 2021. Members of the public are advised to dial in by calling 1-888-273-3658 and entering the public access code (1809972). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 28, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 27, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Expedited Entry of Scheduling Order by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Edward) Modified event on 7/1/2021 (znmw).
June 25, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Martino, I on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Martino, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lisagar on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Lisagar, Matthew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Hoffman Lent on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Lent, Karen)
June 24, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (ztth)
June 24, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION for Protective Order and Production of Investigation Materials filed by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Williamson, Edward) Modified on 6/24/2021 to add filer (eg).
June 24, 2021 MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew Lisagar, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Matthew Lisagar, Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York 10001, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by J udge Reggie B. Walton on June 24, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Karen Hoffman Lent, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Karen Hoffman Lent, Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York 10001, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 24, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew M. Martino, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Matthew M. Martino, Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York 10001, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 24, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendants' #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Sheerin, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Michael J. Sheerin, Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York 10001, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 24, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION for Protective Order and Production of Investigation Materials filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William H. Jones II, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of William H. Jones II, #3 Proposed Order)(Jones, William)
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bozzo on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bozzo, Peter) (Main Document 27 replaced on 6/24/2021) (ztth).
June 23, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew Lisagar, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8550985. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Lisagar in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Aronson, Clifford)
June 23, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Sheerin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8550966. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael J. Sheerin in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Aronson, Clifford)
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew M. Martino, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8550952. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew M. Martino in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Aronson, Clifford)
June 23, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen Hoffman Lent, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8550914. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Aronson, Clifford)
June 23, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE. WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/15/2021. (Aronson, Clifford)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Wales, David)
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Wales on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Wales, David)
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford Hank Aronson on behalf of WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC (Aronson, Clifford)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 23, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Wall on behalf of AON PLC (Wall, Daniel)
June 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order and Production of Investigation Materials by AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Conference, #3 Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of E. Marc Williamson, #5 Proposed Orders)(Williamson, Edward). Added MOTION for Discovery on 6/24/2021 (ztth).
June 22, 2021 Filing 15 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AON PLC (Williamson, Edward)
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to AON PLC, WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the defendant's #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel M. Wall, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Daniel M. Wall, Latham & Watkins LLP, 505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000, San Francisco, CA 94111, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B . Walton on June 21, 2021. (lcrbw1)
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite Mitchell Sullivan on behalf of AON PLC (Sullivan, Marguerite)
June 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Egge on behalf of AON PLC (Egge, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence E. Buterman on behalf of AON PLC (Buterman, Lawrence)
June 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Conner on behalf of AON PLC (Conner, Ian)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel M. Wall, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8540086. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AON PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel M. Wall, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Williamson, Edward)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Marcellus Williamson on behalf of AON PLC (Williamson, Edward)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE. AON PLC waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/15/2021. (Jones, William)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jones, William)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Wayne Strong on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Strong, Curtis)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Leigh Sindel on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sindel, Patricia) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/24/2021) (ztth).
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Heipp on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Heipp, Justin)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, )
June 17, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to bill.jones2@usdoj.gov, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do no include the date for your summons (adh, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Jones, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AON PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AON PLC
Represented By: Edward Marcellus Williamson
Represented By: Daniel M Wall
Represented By: Ian Robert Conner
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Marguerite Mitchell Sullivan
Represented By: Michael G Egge
Represented By: Tara Lynn Tavernia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC
Represented By: Clifford Hank Aronson
Represented By: David P. Wales
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Matthew M Martino, I
Represented By: Matthew Lisagar
Represented By: Michael Sheerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: William Henderson Jones, II
Represented By: Eric Damian Welsh
Represented By: Peter M. Bozzo
Represented By: Andrew James Robinson
Represented By: Curtis Wayne Strong
Represented By: Justin T. Heipp
Represented By: Patricia Leigh Sindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?