JLN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC v. MATTHEWS GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JLN Construction Services, LLC
Defendant: The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, The Mathews Group, Inc. t/a TMG Construction Corporation, MATTHEWS GROUP, INC. and HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021cv01649
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet, confer and file their Joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 by 8/20/2021. (zjth)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: No later than 8/20/21 the parties shall meet, confer and file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/12/21. (DJS)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT to Include Breach of Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by JLN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata Redline Version)(Katz, Joseph)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim #4 by JLN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC.(Katz, Joseph)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(Rothman, Shoshana)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren P. McLaughlin on behalf of MATTHEWS GROUP, INC. (McLaughlin, Lauren)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against JLN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC by MATTHEWS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rothman, Shoshana)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, MATTHEWS GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA (complying with LCvR5.1(c) to include addresses of parties) by JLN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC. (Katz, Joseph)
June 23, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to joe@joekatzlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
June 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, )
June 21, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to joe@joekatzlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, The Mathews Group, Inc. t/a TMG Construction Corporation with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8540131) filed by JLN Construction Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons TMG, #3 Summons Hartford)(Katz, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JLN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC v. MATTHEWS GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mathews Group, Inc. t/a TMG Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEWS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Lauren P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Shoshana E. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lauren P. McLaughlin
Represented By: Shoshana E. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLN Construction Services, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Larry Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?