GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC. v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION d/b/a Amtrak
Plaintiff: GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC.
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION doing business as AMTRAK
Case Number: 1:2021cv01764
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landman, Mark)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/26/2021. (lctjk1)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by August 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/30/2021. (lctjk1)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC. (Espino, Alejandro)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Landman, Mark)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Landman, Mark)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/9/2021. (lctjk1)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA Compliance with LCvR 5.1(c) by GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Espino, Alejandro)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION d/b/a Amtrak with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8570261) filed by GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Espino, Alejandro)
July 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to aespino@tevtlaw.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, )
July 1, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC. v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION d/b/a Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION doing business as AMTRAK
Represented By: Mark S Landman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GONZALEZ & SONS EQUIPMENT, INC.
Represented By: Alejandro Espino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?