OTUMOR v. ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC.D/B/A ANGEL LOVING CARE et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN OTUMOR
Defendant: ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC.D/B/A ANGEL LOVING CARE, FATIATU JOBI and ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC. doing business as ANGEL LOVING CARE
Case Number: 1:2021cv01801
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JONATHAN OTUMOR. (Amster, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FATIATU JOBI served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021 (Amster, Michael)
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021 (Amster, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC., FATIATU JOBI. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 7, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8579949) filed by JONATHAN OTUMOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Amster, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OTUMOR v. ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC.D/B/A ANGEL LOVING CARE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN OTUMOR
Represented By: Michael K. Amster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC.D/B/A ANGEL LOVING CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FATIATU JOBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL LOVING CARE 1, INC. doing business as ANGEL LOVING CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?