QUINN v. KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP et al
Plaintiff: John M Quinn and JOHN M. QUINN
Defendant: James P. Kreindler and Kreindler & Kreindler LLP
Case Number: 1:2021cv01824
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & (6) by JAMES P. KREINDLER, KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP. (Attachments: #1 POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OFDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) & (6), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nagy, Brandon)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emily Kirsch, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8711371. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JAMES P. KREINDLER, KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF EMILY KIRSCH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE)(Nagy, Brandon)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion for extension of time, Dkt. #8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2021. (lcrdm2)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JAMES P. KREINDLER, KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP (Nagy, Brandon)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JAMES P. KREINDLER, KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nagy, Brandon).
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9 . . . . . MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by JAMES P. KREINDLER, KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nagy, Brandon) Modified on 8/4/2021 (ztd).
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon R. Nagy on behalf of All Defendants (Nagy, Brandon)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES P. KREINDLER served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021 (Byrnes, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 (Byrnes, Kevin)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendants' motion for extension of time, Dkt. #7 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his response on or before August 3, 2021. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is STAYED pending resolution of the motion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/30/2021. (lcrdm2)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/9/2021. (lcrdm2)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to JAMES P. KREINDLER, KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James P. Kreindler, Kreindler & Kreindler LLP with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8586082) filed by John M Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Exhibit Three, #4 Exhibit Four, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons to J.P. Kreindler, #7 Summons to Kreindler & Kreindler LLP)(Byrnes, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUINN v. KREINDLER & KREINDLER LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M Quinn
Represented By: Kevin E. Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M. QUINN
Represented By: Kevin E. Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Kreindler
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreindler & Kreindler LLP
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?