WILSON v. MCCARTHY
Petitioner: AARON W. WILSON
Respondent: RYAN MCCARTHY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02185
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order by AARON W. WILSON. (ztd)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas (see document for details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/23/2021.(psu1)
August 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 9/12/2021. (kt)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER VACATING ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES, ECF No. 3. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/20/21. (DM) Modified on 8/20/2021 to correct typo (kt).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/19/2021. (DM) Modified on 8/20/2021 misfiled per chambers (kt).
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Richard J. Leon is no longer assigned to the case as it is not related. (ztnr)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 200405.) filed by AARON W. WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2021: #2 Exhibit) (zjf). Modified on 8/20/2021 to add receipt number (ztth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AARON W. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RYAN MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?