JONES v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: GREGORY JONES
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2021cv02231
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Florence Y Pan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(McGrath, Felicity)
October 1, 2021 Case directly reassigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/31/21. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 24, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 Summons Issued Electronically was entered in error. See #3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) for the correct entry. (znmg)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GREGORY JONES. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) Modified on 8/24/2021 (znmg).
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (znmg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8685034) filed by GREGORY JONES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Duckworth, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY JONES
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?