ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL et al v. BECERRA
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL and BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02240
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Cases Consolidated. Case 21cv1603, 21cv2230 and 21cv2240, have been consolidated with 19mc190 pursuant to Minute Order filed 09/07/2021. ALL PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE NO. 19mc190. (zjf)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, the parties' agreement stated in their Joint Report 134 filed in In re Allina II-Type DSH Adjustment Cases, 19-mc-0190, that these cases are related to and should be consolidated into 19-mc-190, and the Court's review of the complaints in each, the Clerk of Court is directed to CONSOLIDATE the following cases into 19-mc-190: Baylor University Medical Center v. Becerra, 21-cv-1603; Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital v. Becerra, 21-cv-2230; and Alliance Community Hospital v. Becerra, 21-cv-2240. It is FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Report, that Count I in Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital, 21-cv-2230, is HEREBY REMANDED pursuant to the Court's order of January 19, 2021. Order 74 . Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/7/21. (DMK)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
August 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of New Case by ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC.. Case related to Case No. 19-mc-0190. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8686108) filed by ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL et al v. BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?