SRC, INC. v. THEIA GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: SRC Inc. and SRC, INC.
Defendant: Theia Group Inc. and THEIA GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02329
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to THEIA GROUP, INC. (ztth)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by SRC, INC.. (Clopper, John)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Orbach on behalf of SRC, INC. (Orbach, Louis)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's #4 Motion to Admit Louis Orbach Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Louis Orbach, Bond, Schoeneck & King, One Lincoln Center, Syracuse, NY 13202, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 24, 202 1. (lcrbw3)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 23, 2021. (lcrbw3)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SRC, INC. served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/11/2021 (Clopper, John); Modified date served and answer deadline on 9/23/2021 at the request of counsel (ztth).
September 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/11/2021, (ztth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Louis Orbach, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8747063. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SRC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Louis Orbach, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clopper, John)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to THEIA GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
September 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SRC Inc. (Clopper, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Theia Group Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8707945) filed by SRC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(Clopper, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SRC, INC. v. THEIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRC Inc.
Represented By: John D. Clopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRC, INC.
Represented By: Louis Orbach
Represented By: John D. Clopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theia Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?