STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02336
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 11/23/2021. (kk)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Subject to the procedures described herein, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Verizon Fios. Plaintiff's motion for a protective order is DENIED without prejudice. Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 10/07/2021. (lcjd)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #3 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 10/07/21.(lcjd)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management. (zsb)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Full Case Management. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/28/2021. (lcrc3)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Green, Alexander)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Green, Alexander)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8709791) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Richard Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?