DEAKIN et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY et al
Plaintiff: REBECCA CLAIRE DEAKIN, JESS LOKER and MARK LOKER
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY and STEPHANIE SANDERS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02456
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING & PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 5, 2021. (lcckk1)
November 5, 2021 Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2021. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/19/2021. Initial Disclosure due by 12/15/2021. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 2/15/2022. Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 4/15/2022. Status Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for an initial scheduling conference at 2:00 PM ET on November 5, 2021, to occur via teleconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 4, 2021. (lcckk1)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, today's initial scheduling conference is VACATED. The conference will be rescheduled. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 4, 2021. (lcckk1)
November 4, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 2:00 PM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (O'Brien, Eileen)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Stephanie Sanders by REBECCA CLAIRE DEAKIN, JESS LOKER, MARK LOKER. (O'Brien, Eileen)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/2021. (DM)
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Marie O'Brien on behalf of All Plaintiffs (O'Brien, Eileen)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 4, 2021. (lcckk1)
October 4, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal (zsb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re #7 Cover Sheet . (Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 Receipt on 09/22/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 2868 V. (zjf)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority is hereby ordered to show cause by October 1, 2021 why this case should not be remanded to D.C. Superior Court given defendant's failure to remedy the error that the Clerk's Office has identified with its filing and asked defendant to correct on September 20 and 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/24/21. (DMK)
September 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
September 22, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to namirthalingam@kiernantrebach.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WMATA filed by WMATA.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WMATA (Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WMATA re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal . (Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of WMATA (Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2021 CA 002868 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8742619 filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
September 20, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to namirthalingam@kiernantrebach.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEAKIN et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA CLAIRE DEAKIN
Represented By: Eileen Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Max F Maccoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESS LOKER
Represented By: Eileen Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Max F Maccoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK LOKER
Represented By: Eileen Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Max F Maccoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Nimalan Amirthalingam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?