STEWART v. FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: PASSION STEWART
Defendant: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv02478
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PASSION STEWART. (znmw)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PASSION STEWART. (znmw)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 Receipt on 10/6/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 002954 B. (znmw)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 6, 2021. (lcckk1)
October 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #8 due by 10/20/2021. Defendant's Reply to #8 due by 10/27/2021. (dot)
October 5, 2021 Summons (1) Issued as to FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION. (zjf)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Colleen)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION (Wilson, Colleen)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION filed by PASSION STEWART. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(znmw) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/1/2021) (znmw).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/29/2021. (DM)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
September 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION (Wilson, Colleen)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, Civil Division, case number 2021 CA 002954 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8750305 filed by FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint)(Wilson, Colleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART v. FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASSION STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION
Represented By: Colleen Hitch Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?