FERGUSON v. OWEN
Plaintiff: JACOB N. FERGUSON
Defendant: ROBBIN M. OWEN
Case Number: 1:2021cv02512
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Password: Plaintiff has demonstrated compliance with the requirements of LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may obtain a CM/ECF username and password from the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/03/2021. (lcrc1)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JACOB N. FERGUSON. (ztth)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBBIN M. OWEN served on 10/13/2021 (ztth)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/18/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/17/2021.) (ztth)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBBIN M. OWEN (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 2000645) filed by JACOB N. FERGUSON. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ztth)
September 27, 2021 Summons (1) Issued as to JACOB N. FERGUSON. (ztth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERGUSON v. OWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB N. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBIN M. OWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?