HEAD v. SAMPLE et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES HEAD
Defendant: SAMPLE, J. R. BELL, S. EIRICH, K. LILLER, U.S. DEPT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CLARK, DELARAMA, WILMNER, CANNON, BOOTH and BOCH
Case Number: 1:2021cv02550
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:20-cv-01835. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying #31 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #24 Motion to Dismiss; Transferring case to United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/23/2021. (c/m 9/24/2021 bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/23/2021. (c/m 9/23/2021 bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Assistant Warden Sample, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Officer Boch, Officer Booth, Officer Cannon, Officer Clark, Officer Delarama, Officer K. Liller, Officer Wilmner, U.S. Dept. of Justice.(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Charles Head (Attachments: #1 Envelope Envelope (front and back), #2 Memorandum in Support)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #6 Motion for TRO; denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot #15 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #15 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #16 Motion for Leave of the Court to Conduct Limited Discovery ; denying as moot #19 Motion for Request for Service of the Complaint on Defendants. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/8/2021. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-03/09/2021) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing fee: $ 69.20, receipt number 14637126181 (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #26 Response to Motion, filed by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Assistant Warden Sample, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Officer Boch, Officer Booth, Officer Cannon, Officer Clark, Officer Delarama, Officer K. Liller, Officer Wilmner, U.S. Dept. of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing fee: $ 33.30, receipt number 14637125594 (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Assistant Warden Sample, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Officer Boch, Officer Booth, Officer Cannon, Officer Clark, Officer Delarama, Officer K. Liller, Officer Wilmner, U.S. Dept. of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Charles Head (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10-15-2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Assistant Warden Sample, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Officer Boch, Officer Booth, Officer Cannon, Officer Clark, Officer Delarama, Officer K. Liller, Officer Wilmner, U.S. Dept. of Justice (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 Correspondence from Plaintiff Head re: in need of document filed(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 Correspondence from Plaintiff Head (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 Correspondence from Staff Attorney's to Plaintiff Head(jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10-01-2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 Correspondence from Staff Attorney's to Warden(jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-10-01-2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Request for Service of the Complaint on Defendants by Charles Head(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 Correspondence from Plaintiff Head re: previous papers sent in,(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 Supplemental to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Head (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Request for Leave of the Court to Conduct Limited Discovery Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.33 and Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Charles Head(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2020: #1 Exhibit A) (jb5, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike and MOTION for Reconsideration by Charles Head(ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion Substitute Names; All Mailroom Officersof FCI Cumberland Prison with Assistant Warden Sample, Officer Clark, OfficerDelarama, Officer Wilmner, Officer Cannon, Officer Booth, and Officer Boch; Clerk SHALL replace the defendant identified as Unknown SIS Officer with Officer2K. Liller;. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/31/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-07-31-2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 Correspondence from Staff Attorney's re: documents sent to correctional facility to Warden.(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Correspondence from Staff Attorney's re: documents sent to correctional facility for Plaintiff Head.(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Correspondence from Plaintiff Head re: Request for service of pleading and docket sheet(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Request To Substitute Names for Unnamed Defendants by Charles Head(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Plaintiff to identify all unnamed defendants referenced in the complaint within 28 days. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/13/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-07-13-2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time and Other Related Relief by All Mailroom Officers of FCI Cumberland Prison, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, One Unknown Sis Officer of FCI Cumberland, U.S. Dept. of Justice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Correspondence from Plaintiff Head re: Needing a copy of complaint(jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 40.50, receipt number 14637123637 (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charles Head (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibits)(ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Kimberly) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by Charles Head ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/17/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-6/17/2020) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles Head(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Head(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Mailroom Officers of FCI Cumberland Prison, J.R. Bell, S. Eirich, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, One Unknown Sis Officer of FCI Cumberland, U.S. Dept. of Justice, filed by Charles Head. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEAD v. SAMPLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. R. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. EIRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. LILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELARAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?