WAUGH v. CARVAJAL et al
Plaintiff: TOMMY LEE WAUGH
Defendant: MICHAEL D. CARVAJAL, GUY PAGLI, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, RUSSELL WYATT, HAZMA BOUSSAG, MIRANDA FAUST, DAVID BREWER, MICHAEL FRAZIER, RENEE BRINKER FORNSHILL, EUGENE BAIME, RONALD L. RODGERS, KENNETH HYLE, BUREAU OF PRISONS, BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, MICHAEL CARVAJAL and RONALD RODGERS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02624
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Florence Y Pan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Mandamus & Other (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Standing Order Sent to Tommy Lee Waugh; New Address: Unknown. (hmc)
October 18, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 12/13/2021. Response to Dispositive Motion due by 1/12/2022. Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 1/26/2022. (zcdw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Receipt on 10/15/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 002208 B. (zjf)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendants shall file their dispositive motion by December 13, 2021; Plaintiff shall file his opposition by January 12, 2022; and Defendants shall file their reply by January 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 10/18/21. (lcaa)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Case directly reassigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan as related. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/15/2021) (ztnr).
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Briefing Schedule by EUGENE BAIME, HAZMA BOUSSAG, DAVID BREWER, BUREAU OF PRISONS, MICHAEL CARVAJAL, MIRANDA FAUST, RENEE BRINKER FORNSHILL, MICHAEL FRAZIER, KENNETH HYLE, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, GUY PAGLI, RONALD RODGERS, BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, RUSSELL WYATT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DeGenaro, Stephen)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/8/2021. (lctnm2)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
October 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2021 CA 2208B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by HAZMA BOUSSAG, EUGENE BAIME, GUY PAGLI, MIRANDA FAUST, MICHAEL FRAZIER, RONALD L. RODGERS, MICHAEL D. CARVAJAL, BARB VON BLANCKENSEE, BUREAU OF PRISONS, DAVID BREWER, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, KENNETH HYLE, RENEE BRINKER FORNSHILL, RUSSELL WYATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Westfall Certification, #4 Certificate of Service)(DeGenaro, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAUGH v. CARVAJAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY LEE WAUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL D. CARVAJAL
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY PAGLI
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL WYATT
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZMA BOUSSAG
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRANDA FAUST
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BREWER
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL FRAZIER
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE BRINKER FORNSHILL
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE BAIME
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD L. RODGERS
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH HYLE
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARB VON BLANCKENSEE
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD RODGERS
Represented By: Stephen DeGenaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?