KASAY v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: HELEN KASAY and HELEN A. KASAY
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, JAMES WALKER, INEZ SAKI-TAY, LOUISE PETERSON, ANTHONY PRATHER, FERDINAND GAMBOA, ANNETTE TIBBS, HARRIET BROADIE, TIMOTHY HANDY, STEVEN ALLEN, SHAWNTE WILLIAMS, JOHN BARNES, JR., DEREK BROOKS, JOHN DOES 1-12, JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES #1-2 and JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES #1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv02693
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Nathan Rubenstein on behalf of JOHN BARNES, JR, HARRIET BROADIE, DEREK BROOKS, FERDINAND GAMBOA, TIMOTHY HANDY, LOUISE PETERSON, ANTHONY PRATHER, INEZ SAKI-TAY, ANNETTE TIBBS, SHAWNTE WILLIAMS (Rubenstein, Steven)
December 3, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Defendant Barnes by HELEN A. KASAY. (Grenier, Peter)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Defendant James Walker's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Walker shall have until December 31, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/15/2021. (lccrc2) Modified on 11/15/2021 (lsj).
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dennis Trout on behalf of JOHN BARNES, JR, HARRIET BROADIE, DEREK BROOKS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FERDINAND GAMBOA, TIMOTHY HANDY, LOUISE PETERSON, ANTHONY PRATHER, INEZ SAKI-TAY, ANNETTE TIBBS, SHAWNTE WILLIAMS (Trout, Matthew)
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JAMES WALKER. (Long, Leonard)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES WALKER served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021 (Grenier, Peter)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard L Long, Jr on behalf of JAMES WALKER (Long, Leonard)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue. The status conference set for November 8, 2021 is hereby vacated and reset for Monday, December 13, 2021 at 02:00 PM via VTC before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/3/2021. (lccr1)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Continue November 8, 2021 Status Conference by HELEN A. KASAY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Grenier, Peter)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to STEVEN ALLEN, JOHN BARNES, JR. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(znmw)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for a status conference on November 8, 2021 at 11:00 AM via VTC before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. This will be a combined status for the related cases Kasay v. District of Columbia and Gormly v. Walker. The Court expects counsel for the parties in both cases to be present. Video connection information will be emailed to the parties separately. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/1/2021. (lccrc1)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Upon John Barnes Jr. filed by HELEN A. KASAY.(Grenier, Peter)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Upon Steven Allen filed by HELEN A. KASAY.(Grenier, Peter)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JAMES WALKER. (znmw)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Upon James Walker filed by HELEN A. KASAY.(Grenier, Peter)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Grenier on behalf of HELEN A. KASAY (Grenier, Peter)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 District of Columbia Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants District of Columbia, Inez Saki-Tay, Louise Peterson, Harriet A. Broadie, Anthony Prather, Ferdinand Gamboa, Anette Tibbs, Derek Brooks, Timothy Handy, John Barnes, Jr., and Shawnte Williams shall have until December 20, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/26/2021. (lccrc1)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby notified that the served defendants need not be reserved. Any pending motions filed in Superior Court that the parties would like the Court to consider must be refiled in this Court. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/22/2021. (lccrc1)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOHN BARNES, JR, HARRIET BROADIE, DEREK BROOKS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FERDINAND GAMBOA, TIMOTHY HANDY, LOUISE PETERSON, ANTHONY PRATHER, INEZ SAKI-TAY, ANNETTE TIBBS, SHAWNTE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Heath, Brendan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Receipt on 10/20/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 002636 B. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8)(znmw)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
October 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-2688. (Rubenstein, Steven)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 002836 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Related Case Form)(Rubenstein, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KASAY v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN KASAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN A. KASAY
Represented By: Peter C. Grenier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES WALKER
Represented By: Leonard L Long, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INEZ SAKI-TAY
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUISE PETERSON
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY PRATHER
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERDINAND GAMBOA
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNETTE TIBBS
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIET BROADIE
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY HANDY
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWNTE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BARNES, JR.
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK BROOKS
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Trout
Represented By: Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Represented By: Brendan Russell Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES #1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE EMPLOYEES #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?