DENNEKAMP v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Plaintiff: GERT-JAN DENNEKAMP
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Case Number: 1:2021cv02727
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of GERT-JAN DENNEKAMP (Stotter, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/23/2021. (lctjk2)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Cirino, Paul)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Cirino, Paul)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Gert-Jan Dennekamp against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8802743) filed by GERT-JAN DENNEKAMP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Quaranto, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DENNEKAMP v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERT-JAN DENNEKAMP
Represented By: Lance Quaranto
Represented By: Daniel J. Stotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?