SIMPKINS v. ELLSBERG et al
Plaintiff: CHARLENE SIMPKINS
Defendant: DAVID ELLSBERG, UNNAMED INDIVIDUAL (DHS-1), UNNAMED INDIVIDUAL (DHS-2), DWAYNE HICKMAN, D'ANGELO HICKS, UNNAMED INDIVIDUAL (USM-1), CPEP, CPEP Personnel, CPEP TRANSPORT OPERATOR (TO-1), CPEP TRANSPORT OPERATOR (TO-2), D.C. DEPT. OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, D.C. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, UNNAMED DEFENDANT (MPD-1), UNNAMED DEFENDANT (MPD-2) and DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02771
Filed: October 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Modification by Referencing Title 18 as a Cause of Action by CHARLENE SIMPKINS (znmg) Modified docket text on 11/22/2021 (znmw).
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that by 12/12/2021 plaintiff should file an amended complaint containing her full residence address, or alternatively, a motion setting forth reasons to use the P.O. Box address; see Order for full details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/12/2021. (ztnr)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Addresses Listed on Complaint and AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CHARLENE SIMPKINS.(znmg)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Caption Modification made to Certain Defendant Identities by CHARLENE SIMPKINS (znmg) Modified docket text on 11/22/2021 (znmw).
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Inclusion of Plaintiff's Email Address by CHARLENE SIMPKINS (znmg) Modified docket text on 11/22/2021 (znmw).
October 24, 2021 Filing 4 ERRATA by CHARLENE SIMPKINS re #1 Complaint filed by CHARLENE SIMPKINS, #3 Amended Complaint filed by CHARLENE SIMPKINS. (znmw)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CHARLENE SIMPKINS.(znmw)
October 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLENE SIMPKINS. (znmw)
October 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CHARLENE SIMPKINS.(znmw)
October 17, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/17/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMPKINS v. ELLSBERG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE SIMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ELLSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED INDIVIDUAL (DHS-1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED INDIVIDUAL (DHS-2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWAYNE HICKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'ANGELO HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED INDIVIDUAL (USM-1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPEP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPEP Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPEP TRANSPORT OPERATOR (TO-1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPEP TRANSPORT OPERATOR (TO-2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. DEPT. OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED DEFENDANT (MPD-1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED DEFENDANT (MPD-2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?