ALTSCHULD et al v. RAIMONDO et al
Plaintiff: DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD, DAN ALTSCHULD, MARK S AMATO, CYNTHIA MATSUMOTO, MIKE ORLOFF, JEANINE CLARKE, JOSHUA CRIBBS, JOHN EDSON, KIMBERLY ELSHOLZ, CHARLES L CARPENTER, JAMES CERNOCK, KIMBERLY R CHRISTOFF, AINSLIE M COVE, JEFFREY DICE, DAVID R HEIMANN, TROY L HESS, WESLEY W HOEKWATER, AUDRA M MORRIS, MATTHEW D SEIFERT, JAROD SMITH, DONALD E SNIVELY, JAMIE G STDENNIS, CALEB STEELE, CHRIS STINCHFIELD, SUZANNE TAYLOR, MICHAEL WEINFURNTER, AARON WIERSUM, AMANDA C WILLIAMS, JONATHAN D WILLIAMS, JOSHUA WHITE, JASON MCNABB, MELINA G ROYER, MICHAEL A SPELLANE, KEVIN T COFFMAN, DAVID T HARMON, SUSAN A ROGERS, CHERYL L KOEVOET, KEMMI SANDLER, MARCUS W THORNTON, ERIN WILLIAMS, B.J. MONTGOMERY, DOMINIC W BIES, STEVEN R GEORGE, MARTIN J KNOTT, JR., IRVING LARA, ALEX LEWANDOWSKI, TRAVIS MCKINNEY, DOUG POPOVICH, SARAH SMITH, AARON WOODS, MICHAEL WILSON and JENNIFER C NICKISCH
Defendant: Secretary GINA M. RAIMONDO and GINA M. RAIMONDO
Not Classified By Court: LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, Tom Vilsack, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, ANTONY BLINKEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, AVRIL HAINES, XAVIER BECERRA and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02779
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint Under Pseudonym by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Clean Amended Complaint, #3 Supplement Redlined Amended Complaint)(Montalvo, Eric)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion #26 to File Amended Complaint Under Pseudonym is hereby DENIED without prejudice. To proceed by pseudonym the movant must also file a sealed version of the document that contains the name of the parties who will proceed by Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/9/21. (DJS)
December 8, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion and Incorporated Memorandum for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Under Pseudonym by DAN ALTSCHULD, MARK S AMATO, DOMINIC W BIES, CHARLES L CARPENTER, JAMES CERNOCK, KIMBERLY R CHRISTOFF, JEANINE CLARKE, KEVIN T COFFMAN, AINSLIE M COVE, JOSHUA CRIBBS, JEFFREY DICE, JOHN EDSON, KIMBERLY ELSHOLZ, STEVEN R GEORGE, DAVID T HARMON, DAVID R HEIMANN, TROY L HESS, WESLEY W HOEKWATER, MARTIN J KNOTT, JR., CHERYL L KOEVOET, IRVING LARA, ALEX LEWANDOWSKI, CYNTHIA MATSUMOTO, TRAVIS MCKINNEY, JASON MCNABB, B.J. MONTGOMERY, AUDRA M MORRIS, JENNIFER C NICKISCH, MIKE ORLOFF, DOUG POPOVICH, SUSAN A ROGERS, MELINA G ROYER, KEMMI SANDLER, MATTHEW D SEIFERT, JAROD SMITH, SARAH SMITH, DONALD E SNIVELY, MICHAEL A SPELLANE, JAMIE G STDENNIS, CALEB STEELE, CHRIS STINCHFIELD, SUZANNE TAYLOR, MARCUS W THORNTON, MICHAEL WEINFURNTER, JOSHUA WHITE, AARON WIERSUM, AMANDA C WILLIAMS, ERIN WILLIAMS, JONATHAN D WILLIAMS, MICHAEL WILSON, AARON WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Clean Copy, #2 Redlined Copy, #3 Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified event on 12/9/2021 (znmw).
December 7, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleading due by 12/8/2021. (tb)
December 3, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint Incorporating Additional Plaintiffs by DAN ALTSCHULD, MARK S AMATO, DOMINIC W BIES, CHARLES L CARPENTER, JAMES CERNOCK, KIMBERLY R CHRISTOFF, JEANINE CLARKE, KEVIN T COFFMAN, AINSLIE M COVE, JOSHUA CRIBBS, JEFFREY DICE, JOHN EDSON, KIMBERLY ELSHOLZ, STEVEN R GEORGE, DAVID T HARMON, DAVID R HEIMANN, TROY L HESS, WESLEY W HOEKWATER, MARTIN J KNOTT, JR., CHERYL L KOEVOET, IRVING LARA, ALEX LEWANDOWSKI, CYNTHIA MATSUMOTO, TRAVIS MCKINNEY, JASON MCNABB, B.J. MONTGOMERY, AUDRA M MORRIS, JENNIFER C NICKISCH, MIKE ORLOFF, SUSAN A ROGERS, MELINA G ROYER, KEMMI SANDLER, MATTHEW D SEIFERT, JAROD SMITH, SARAH SMITH, DONALD E SNIVELY, MICHAEL A SPELLANE, JAMIE G STDENNIS, CALEB STEELE, CHRIS STINCHFIELD, SUZANNE TAYLOR, MARCUS W THORNTON, MICHAEL WEINFURNTER, JOSHUA WHITE, AARON WIERSUM, AMANDA C WILLIAMS, ERIN WILLIAMS, JONATHAN D WILLIAMS, MICHAEL WILSON, AARON WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion #25 for Extension of Deadlines. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint due 12/8/21. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/3/21. (DJS)
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, ANTONY BLINKEN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, MERRICK B. GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, AVRIL HAINES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MICHAEL S. REGAN, TOM VILSACK. (Merritt, R.)
November 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2021. (tb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By 11/22/21 the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint status report with a proposal for moving forward with this action. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/15/2021. (lcac)
November 8, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re #4 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2021. (lcac)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2021. (lcac)
November 8, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT OF 11/5/21 MOTION HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on November 5, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: 11/8/2021. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the t ranscript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2022.(Wayne, Bryan)
November 5, 2021 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2021 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DAN ALTSCHULD; motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Michels, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michels, John)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Proposed Declaration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Alexander Lewandowski)(Thompson, Carol)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #17 is hereby DENIED. Plaintiffs failed to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(m), which requires that a movant confer with opposing counsel prior to filing a non-dispositive motion and indicate whether the motion is opposed or unopposed. More importantly, the court finds that the proposed filing is not relevant to the issues currently before the court. Plaintiffs' second Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #19 is hereby DENIED without prejudice for failing to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(m). Additionally, Plaintiffs have not explained why it would be impracticable to file a redacted version of the proffered document on the public docket. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/05/2021. (lcac)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, ANTONY BLINKEN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, AVRIL HAINES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MICHAEL S. REGAN, TOM VILSACK re #14 Response to motion, (Merritt, R.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Thompson, Carol)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Exhibit to be Filed Under Seal, #6 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Exhibit to be Filed Under Seal)(Thompson, Carol)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Anne Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Carol)
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction in Opposition filed by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, ANTONY BLINKEN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, AVRIL HAINES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MICHAEL S. REGAN, TOM VILSACK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, R.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #2 is hereby DENIED without prejudice. It does not appear that Plaintiffs have complied with Local Civil Rule 5.1(h)(1) which provides in pertinent part: "A document filed with the intention of it being sealed in an otherwise public case must be filed by electronic means in a manner authorized by the Clerk and shall be accompanied by a motion to seal." Further, the motion was filed prior to Defendants' entry of appearance and does not meet the requirements of Local Civil Rule 7(m). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/3/21. (DJS)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Memorandum on Imminent Injury by DAN ALTSCHULD, MARK S AMATO, DOMINIC W BIES, CHARLES L CARPENTER, JAMES CERNOCK, KIMBERLY R CHRISTOFF, JEANINE CLARKE, KEVIN T COFFMAN, AINSLIE M COVE, JOSHUA CRIBBS, JEFFREY DICE, JOHN EDSON, KIMBERLY ELSHOLZ, STEVEN R GEORGE, DAVID T HARMON, DAVID R HEIMANN, TROY L HESS, WESLEY W HOEKWATER, MARTIN J KNOTT, JR., CHERYL L KOEVOET, IRVING LARA, ALEX LEWANDOWSKI, CYNTHIA MATSUMOTO, TRAVIS MCKINNEY, JASON MCNABB, B.J. MONTGOMERY, AUDRA M MORRIS, JENNIFER C NICKISCH, MIKE ORLOFF, DOUG POPOVICH, SUSAN A ROGERS, MELINA G ROYER, KEMMI SANDLER, MATTHEW D SEIFERT, JAROD SMITH, SARAH SMITH, DONALD E SNIVELY, MICHAEL A SPELLANE, JAMIE G STDENNIS, CALEB STEELE, CHRIS STINCHFIELD, SUZANNE TAYLOR, MARCUS W THORNTON, MICHAEL WEINFURNTER, JOSHUA WHITE, AARON WIERSUM, AMANDA C WILLIAMS, ERIN WILLIAMS, JONATHAN D WILLIAMS, MICHAEL WILSON, AARON WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2_Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6_Redacted, #7 Exhibit 7)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified event title on 11/2/2021 (znmw).
November 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2021. (tb)
November 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 11/3/2021 Reply due by 11/4/2021. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #11 Defendants' Motion for Extension to File Response/Reply. Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is now due on or before noon on 11/3. Plaintiffs' Reply is now due on or before noon on 11/4. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/02/2021. (lcac)
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, ANTONY BLINKEN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, AVRIL HAINES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MICHAEL S. REGAN, TOM VILSACK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merritt, R.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (znmw)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In the parties' Joint Status Report #9 , Defendants raised colorable claims that "extensive procedures that would govern most potential adverse employment actions" would prevent irreparable harm to Plaintiffs from occurring on November 9, 2021. Based on these arguments, Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to show cause no later than 5 PM on 11/2/21 as to why injunctive relief will be required by November 9, 2021. Plaintiffs' briefing shall not exceed 5 pages in length. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/01/2021. (lcac)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, ANTONY BLINKEN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, AVRIL HAINES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MICHAEL S. REGAN, TOM VILSACK. (Merritt, R.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE The US Attorney for DC re #1 Complaint,, filed by DAN ALTSCHULD. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by MARK S AMATO, CYNTHIA MATSUMOTO, DAN ALTSCHULD, MIKE ORLOFF.(Montalvo, Eric)
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Charlie Merritt on behalf of All Defendants (Merritt, R.)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #9 Joint Status Report, the court hereby ORDERS that the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file a joint opposition or their respective oppositions to Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by 11/3/21 at 12:00 AM. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by 11/4/21 at 12:00 AM. The court further ORDERS that a hearing is set for 11/5/21 at 3:00 PM via video teleconference before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. A courtroom deputy will provide the parties with dial-in instructions by email. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/29/2021. (lcac)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the court hereby directs Plaintiffs to contact Defendants to meet and confer and file a joint status report, along with a briefing schedule regarding Plaintiff's motion, no later than October 29 at 5 PM. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/28/2021. (lcac)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, ANTONY BLINKEN, WILLIAM J. BURNS, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, AVRIL HAINES, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, SAMANTHA POWER, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MICHAEL S. REGAN, TOM VILSACK. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 27, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, )
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD, SUSAN A ROGERS, DAVID T HARMON, CHRIS STINCHFIELD, KIMBERLY ELSHOLZ, JONATHAN D WILLIAMS, MATTHEW D SEIFERT, MARK S AMATO, DAN ALTSCHULD, JAROD SMITH, MICHAEL A SPELLANE, AUDRA M MORRIS, TRAVIS MCKINNEY, AMANDA C WILLIAMS, JOSHUA WHITE, JASON MCNABB, STEVEN R GEORGE, CALEB STEELE, TROY L HESS, JENNIFER C NICKISCH, AARON WIERSUM, KIMBERLY R CHRISTOFF, KEVIN T COFFMAN, KEMMI SANDLER, AINSLIE M COVE, MICHAEL WILSON, SUZANNE TAYLOR, LARA G IRVING, SARAH SMITH, MICHAEL WEINFURNTER, DAVID R HEIMANN, MELINA G ROYER, JOHN EDSON, DONALD E SNIVELY, DOMINIC W BIES, MARCUS W THORNTON, Cynthia MATSUMOTO, JAMES CERNOCK, MIKE ORLOFF, JEFFREY DICE, MARTIN J KNOTT, JR., AARON WOODS, WESLEY W HOEKWATER, CHARLES L CARPENTER, B.J. MONTGOMERY, JEANINE CLARKE, CHERYL L KOEVOET, ERIN WILLIAMS, DOUG POPOVICH, JAMIE G STDENNIS, ALEX LEWANDOWSKI, JOSHUA CRIBBS. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request to Issue Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified on 10/27/2021 (znmw).
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Montalvo, Eric)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File and Waive Requirements under LCvR 5.1 by DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Altschuld, et al against All Plaintiffs Raimondo, et al ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8810919) filed by DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALTSCHULD et al v. RAIMONDO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN ET AL ALTSCHULD
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAN ALTSCHULD
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK S AMATO
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MATSUMOTO
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE ORLOFF
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANINE CLARKE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CRIBBS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN EDSON
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ELSHOLZ
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES L CARPENTER
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CERNOCK
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY R CHRISTOFF
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AINSLIE M COVE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY DICE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID R HEIMANN
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY L HESS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY W HOEKWATER
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDRA M MORRIS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW D SEIFERT
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAROD SMITH
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD E SNIVELY
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE G STDENNIS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEB STEELE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS STINCHFIELD
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE TAYLOR
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WEINFURNTER
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON WIERSUM
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA C WILLIAMS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN D WILLIAMS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA WHITE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON MCNABB
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINA G ROYER
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A SPELLANE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN T COFFMAN
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID T HARMON
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN A ROGERS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL L KOEVOET
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEMMI SANDLER
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS W THORNTON
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.J. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIC W BIES
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN R GEORGE
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN J KNOTT, JR.
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRVING LARA
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX LEWANDOWSKI
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS MCKINNEY
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG POPOVICH
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH SMITH
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON WOODS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WILSON
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER C NICKISCH
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Represented By: John J. Michels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SAMANTHA POWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Tom Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ANTONY BLINKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MICHAEL S. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WILLIAM J. BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: AVRIL HAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Carol Anne Thompson
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary GINA M. RAIMONDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA M. RAIMONDO
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?