PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Petitioner: PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02797
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/10/2022, (zjch, )
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before January 10, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 4, 2021. (lcdlf2)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yurekli, Gokce)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 21, 2021. (lcdlf2)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. (Weismann, Anne)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8815494) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons U.S. Dep't of Treasury, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Weismann, Anne)
October 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Represented By: Anne L. Weismann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Gokce Tugce Yurekli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?