RICHARDSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff: JANET L RICHARDSON and JANET L. RICHARDSON
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02810
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error, incorrect event used. Pleading has been refiled by the Clerk's Office. (zeg)
November 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/27/2022. (hmc)
November 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's #8 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. The Government shall now respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before January 27, 2022. Further requests for extensions will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/27/2021. (lctnm1)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schifano, Larry)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Steven Schifano on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schifano, Larry)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2021. (zeg)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/29/2021 (Manos, Marcus)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 11/1/2021. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2021. (Manos, Marcus) Modified on 12/2/2021 (zeg).
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/01/2021. (Manos, Marcus)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/25/2021. (lctnm1)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8818053) filed by JANET L RICHARDSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Manos, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET L RICHARDSON
Represented By: Marcus Angelo Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET L. RICHARDSON
Represented By: Marcus Angelo Manos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Larry Steven Schifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?