CHURCH et al v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN CHURCH, LESLEY CHURCH, ALMA GONZALEZ, DYNIKA BARNWELL, DOUGLAS CZERWINSKI, JASON COFFEY, JOSHUA SCHMIDT, MELINA ROYER, TAMIKA WALLS, JAIME ESPITIA, SOMER STEPHENS, ALEX BERNE, ALAN CAMP, STEPHANIE PERROTTA, CHRISTOPHER AXTELL, GRACE BROWN, KRISTOFOR HALLFRISCH, DOROTHY MORGAN, ANDREW SOTO, CHRISTOPHER HALL and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: JOSEPH R. BIDEN, LLOYD J. AUSTIN III, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, JANET YELLEN, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, THOMAS J. VILSACK, GINA M. RAIMONDO, MARTIN J. WALSH, XAVIER BECERRA, MARCIA L. FUDGE, PETER BUTTIGIEG, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, MIGUEL CARDONA, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ROBIN CARNAHAN, DENIS MCDONOUGH, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, ANTONY BLINKEN and MERRICK B. GARLAND
Case Number: 1:2021cv02815
Filed: October 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Intent to Proceed on the Merits of Plaintiffs' Original Complaint (ECF No. 1) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Yoder, Michael)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 1/21/2022. (dot)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' #20 Notice. As proposed therein, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their amended complaint by no later than JANUARY 21, 2022 in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and the applicable local rules. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/18/22. (lcckk3)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE , re: Minute Order dated 1/12/22 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Yoder, Michael)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On January 5, 2022, the Court granted Defendants' #19 Consent Motion to Stay Deadline, in which Defendants requested a stay of their January 11, 2022 deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint because Plaintiffs' counsel had indicated that Plaintiffs intended to file an amended complaint by January 7, 2022. As of the date of this Minute Order, no amended complaint has been filed. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a notice by no later than JANUARY 14, 2022 indicating whether or not they intend to file an amended complaint and, if so, a proposed date for doing so. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/12/22. (lcckk3)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, (Motion to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint) by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, ANTONY BLINKEN, PETER BUTTIGIEG, MIGUEL CARDONA, ROBIN CARNAHAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MERRICK B. GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DENIS MCDONOUGH, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, GINA M. RAIMONDO, THOMAS J. VILSACK, MARTIN J. WALSH, JANET YELLEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #19 Consent Motion to Stay Deadline, in which Defendants seek a stay of their deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, which is currently due by January 11, 2022. Defendants indicate that Plaintiffs' counsel has informed Defendants' counsel that Plaintiffs intend to file an amended complaint by January 7, 2022. Accordingly, Defendants seek a stay of their current deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint "to avoid any possibility of failing to timely respond to the original complaint in the unanticipated event that Plaintiffs do not file their amended complaint prior to January 11, 2022." Plaintiffs consent to Defendants' motion to stay. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendants' #19 motion and ORDERS that Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is STAYED pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/5/22. (lcckk3)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, PETER BUTTIGIEG, MIGUEL CARDONA, ROBIN CARNAHAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MERRICK B. GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DENIS MCDONOUGH, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, GINA M. RAIMONDO, THOMAS J. VILSACK, MARTIN J. WALSH, JANET YELLEN. (Myers, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court ORDERS the parties to file by no later than NOVEMBER 12, 2021 a joint status report indicating how they intend to proceed in this matter, including a proposed schedule for briefing Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/9/21. (lcckk3)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #16 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/8/2021. (lcckk3)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #5 Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/8/2021. (lcckk3)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, PETER BUTTIGIEG, MIGUEL CARDONA, ROBIN CARNAHAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DENIS MCDONOUGH, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, GINA M. RAIMONDO, THOMAS J. VILSACK, MARTIN J. WALSH, JANET YELLEN re #13 Memorandum in Opposition,,,, (Myers, Steven)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS, CHRISTOPHER AXTELL, DYNIKA BARNWELL, ALEX BERNE, GRACE BROWN, ALAN CAMP, LESLEY CHURCH, STEVEN CHURCH, JASON COFFEY, DOUGLAS CZERWINSKI, JAIME ESPITIA, ALMA GONZALEZ, CHRISTOPHER HALL, KRISTOFOR HALLFRISCH, DOROTHY MORGAN, STEPHANIE PERROTTA, MELINA ROYER, JOSHUA SCHMIDT, ANDREW SOTO, SOMER STEPHENS, TAMIKA WALLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NAVMC 118(11), Kimberly Taylor)(Yoder, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, PETER BUTTIGIEG, MIGUEL CARDONA, ROBIN CARNAHAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DENIS MCDONOUGH, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, GINA M. RAIMONDO, THOMAS J. VILSACK, MARTIN J. WALSH, JANET YELLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Peter Marks, #2 Exhibit 2 - FRAGO 5, #3 Exhibit 3 - Air Force Implementation Guidance, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of David J. Furness, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Jeremy W. Beaven, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of William M. Jurney, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Kerry A. Cerny, #8 Exhibit 8 - EOP Vaccination Policy, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Colonel Tonya Rans, #10 Exhibit 10 - Memorandum for Air Force Commanders, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Major Scott Stanley, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Steven)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/01/2021. (DM)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 29, 2021. (lcckk1)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on October 27, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-26. Date of Issuance: October 29, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022.(Edwards, Lisa)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE (Supplemental) in response to Court order by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, PETER BUTTIGIEG, MIGUEL CARDONA, ROBIN CARNAHAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DENIS MCDONOUGH, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, GINA M. RAIMONDO, THOMAS J. VILSACK, MARTIN J. WALSH, JANET YELLEN (Myers, Steven)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response to #5 due by 11/2/2021. Plaintiffs' Reply to #5 due by 11/3/2021. (dot)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE in response to Court order by LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, XAVIER BECERRA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, PETER BUTTIGIEG, MIGUEL CARDONA, ROBIN CARNAHAN, MARCIA L. FUDGE, MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND, JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM, DEBRA ANN HAALAND, KILOLO KIJAKAZI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, DENIS MCDONOUGH, CLARENCE W. NELSON II, GINA M. RAIMONDO, THOMAS J. VILSACK, MARTIN J. WALSH, JANET YELLEN (Myers, Steven)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #8 Notice, in which Defendants indicate that none of the civilian employee plaintiffs will be subject to discipline while his or her request for a religious exception is pending. See Notice 1, n.1. Defendants also indicate that the active duty military plaintiffs, whose religious exception requests have been denied, will not be disciplined or separated during the pendency of their appeals. See Notice 2. In sum, Defendants indicate that plaintiffs will not be disciplined by their employers while their employers consider their exception requests. However, Defendants' notice provides no guarantee of what will happen to plaintiffs if their exception requests are denied and if they reach the point of being disciplined or terminated pending briefing of Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO Motion") and Defendants' forthcoming motion to dismiss. Defendants indicate merely that they shall "notify the Court" if any plaintiff receives a final determination denying his or her request for a religious exception pending the briefing of and the Court's resolution of Plaintiffs' TRO Motion and Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss. It is not clear to the Court that this Notice sufficiently addresses the Court's concern that the Plaintiffs will not be disciplined or terminated while briefing is completed pursuant to the extended scheduled requested by Defendants. It therefore appears that Plaintiffs may be prejudiced by the proposed extended briefing schedule. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendants to file a supplemental notice by no later than OCTOBER 29, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. indicating whether or not they shall agree voluntarily that no plaintiff will be disciplined or terminated pending the Court's ruling on the TRO Motion. Absent such agreement, the Court shall order bifurcated briefing, requiring Defendants to file an expedited opposition to the TRO Motion (by no later than November 2, with a reply due by no later than November 3) and to file their proposed motion to dismiss in accordance with the schedule discussed during the October 27, 2021 teleconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/28/21. (lcckk3)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Evan Carmichael on behalf of All Defendants (Carmichael, Andrew)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CHRISTOPHER AXTELL, DYNIKA BARNWELL, ALEX BERNE, GRACE BROWN, ALAN CAMP, LESLEY CHURCH, STEVEN CHURCH, JASON COFFEY, DOUGLAS CZERWINSKI, JAIME ESPITIA, ALMA GONZALEZ, CHRISTOPHER HALL, KRISTOFOR HALLFRISCH, DOROTHY MORGAN, STEPHANIE PERROTTA, MELINA ROYER, JOSHUA SCHMIDT, ANDREW SOTO, SOMER STEPHENS, TAMIKA WALLS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Yoder, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court held a teleconference in this matter on October 27, 2021 to discuss a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. As discussed during the scheduling teleconference, Defendants shall file a Notice regarding the policies applicable to Plaintiffs pending consideration of exemption requests and appeals by no later than OCTOBER 28, 2021 at 6:00 p.m. Upon review of Defendants' Notice, the Court shall order a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' TRO Motion and Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/27/21. (lcckk3)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case directly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly as related. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (19) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Permission to Omit Home Addresses From Caption pursuant to LCvR 5.1(c)(1) by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Steven Church, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Lesley Church, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Grace Brown, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Alma Gonzalez, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Dynika Barnwell, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Douglas Czerwinski, #8 Affidavit Affidavit of Special Agent Jason Coffey, #9 Affidavit Affidavit of Joshua Schmidt, #10 Affidavit Affidavit of Melina Royer, #11 Affidavit Affidavit of Tamika Walls, #12 Affidavit Affidavit of Jaime Espitia, #13 Affidavit Affidavit of Somer Stephens, #14 Affidavit Affidavit of Alex Berne, #15 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan Camp, #16 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephanie Perrotta, #17 Affidavit Affidavit of Christopher Axtell, #18 Affidavit Affidavit of Special Agent Kristofor Hallfrisch, #19 Affidavit Affidavit of Dorothy Morgan)(Yoder, Michael) Modified on 10/25/2021 to edit docket text (znmg).
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT STEVEN CHURCH, et al. against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8819231) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to President Joseph R. Biden, #3 Summons Summons to Secretary Lloyd J. Austin III, #4 Summons Summons to Secretary Antony J. Blinken, #5 Summons Summons to Secretary Janet Yellen, #6 Summons Summons to Attorney General Merrick Garland, #7 Summons Summons to Secretary Debra Ann Haaland, #8 Summons Summons to Secretary Thomas J. Vilsack, #9 Summons Summons to Secretary Gina M. Raimondo, #10 Summons Summons to Secretary Martin J. Walsh, #11 Summons Summons to Secretary Xavier Becerra, #12 Summons Summons to Secretary Marcia L. Fudge, #13 Summons Summons to Secretary Peter Buttigieg, #14 Summons Summons to Secretary Jennifer M. Granholm, #15 Summons Summons to Secretary Miguel Cardona, #16 Summons Summons to Secretary Denis McDonough, #17 Summons Summons to Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, #18 Summons Summons to Administrator Clarence W. Nelson II, #19 Summons Summons to Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi, #20 Summons Summons to Administrator Robin Carnahan, #21 Exhibit Executive Order 13991, #22 Exhibit SECDEF Order, #23 Exhibit Executive Order 14043, #24 Exhibit Task Force Guidance, #25 Exhibit Task Force Video Footage (.mp4 file to Clerk of Court), #26 Exhibit Affidavit of Authentication, #27 Exhibit Affidavit of Authentication, #28 Exhibit Affidavit of Authentication, #29 Exhibit Dept. of Navy Denial Letter, #30 Exhibit Dept. of Navy Denial Letter, #31 Exhibit COVID-19 Statistics, #32 Exhibit DOJ Memorandum to the President)(Yoder, Michael) Modified on 10/25/2021 to edit docket text (znmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHURCH et al v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN CHURCH
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLEY CHURCH
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA GONZALEZ
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYNIKA BARNWELL
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS CZERWINSKI
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON COFFEY
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA SCHMIDT
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINA ROYER
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMIKA WALLS
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME ESPITIA
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOMER STEPHENS
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX BERNE
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN CAMP
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PERROTTA
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER AXTELL
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE BROWN
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOFOR HALLFRISCH
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY MORGAN
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW SOTO
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HALL
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Michael Alan Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH R. BIDEN
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD J. AUSTIN III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONY J. BLINKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET YELLEN
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK BRIAN GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA ANN HAALAND
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. VILSACK
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA M. RAIMONDO
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J. WALSH
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCIA L. FUDGE
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER BUTTIGIEG
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER M. GRANHOLM
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL CARDONA
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARENCE W. NELSON II
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KILOLO KIJAKAZI
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN CARNAHAN
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENIS MCDONOUGH
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?