AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff: AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY, D/B/A/ OPENTHEBOOKS.COM and AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY doing business as OPENTHEBOOKS.COM
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2021cv02821
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by February 10, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/14/2021.
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 13, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2021. (lcapm2)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Valdivia, Diana)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Valdivia, Diana)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
October 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY, D/B/A/ OPENTHEBOOKS.COM (Orfanedes, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8820898) filed by AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY, D/B/A/ OPENTHEBOOKS.COM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, #3 Summons for US Attorney General, #4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Orfanedes, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY, D/B/A/ OPENTHEBOOKS.COM
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY doing business as OPENTHEBOOKS.COM
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Diana Viggiano Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?