WILDEARTH GUARDIANS et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT and ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS and DEB HAALAND
Case Number: 1:2021cv02864
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' motion to transfer venue [ECF No. 12] and for sixty-day extension of early case deadlines by DEB HAALAND, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Norway, Robert)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case by DEB HAALAND, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Abbott and Memo. of Understanding, #2 Proposed Order)(Norway, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Herman on behalf of All Defendants (Herman, Brian)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mark Norway on behalf of All Defendants (Norway, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mark Norway on behalf of All Defendants (Norway, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/8/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEB HAALAND served on 11/8/2021; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 11/8/2021; MARTHA WILLIAMS served on 11/8/2021. (See Docket Entry #7 to view document). (znmw)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/8/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/7/2022. (Schwartz, Jennifer)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sandler on behalf of ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD (Sandler, Matthew)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/2/2021. (lcrdm2)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Persell on behalf of WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT (Persell, John) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/29/2021) (znmw).
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEB HAALAND, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, MARTHA WILLIAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
October 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Statement RULE LCvR 26.1 from PLAINTIFFS. (Schwartz, Jennifer)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8830142) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Schwartz, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Jennifer R. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Represented By: John S. Persell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD
Represented By: Matthew Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Robert Mark Norway
Represented By: Brian R. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Robert Mark Norway
Represented By: Brian R. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB HAALAND
Represented By: Robert Mark Norway
Represented By: Brian R. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?