ABDALLAH et al v ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED ABDALLAH, HUSSEIN HABIB FARHAT, AHMAD KANAAN, ESTATE OF ALI SHOUMAN, FOUAD ABBOUD, BASHIR MEHDI, ESTATE OF HUSSEIN HAZIMEH, IBRAHIM ABBOUD, ESTATE OF ISSAM MANSOUR, KASSEM AJEEB, MAHMOUD YAKZAN, MOHAMAD CHAMOUN, MOHAMMED LABAN, KAYED FAWAZ and HUSSEIN FARHAT
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN and IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv02889
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Defendant, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 Receipt for Iran, #2 Receipt for MOIS) (zjf)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs and defendant, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See Docket Entries #5 #6 to view documents) (zjf)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED ABDALLAH(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Perry, Amanda)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING on Iranian Ministry of Information and Security, on behalf of all Plaintiffs by MOHAMMED ABDALLAH. (Perry, Amanda)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING on Islamic Republic of Iran, on behalf of all Plaintiffs by MOHAMMED ABDALLAH. (Perry, Amanda)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants #3 the Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c). The Plaintiffs need not include their full residence addresses in their initial pleading. The Plaintiffs shall file under seal a list of the names and residence addresses of all Plaintiffs by 12/8/2021. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/8/2021. (lccrc2)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(e) by MOHAMMED ABDALLAH. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Amanda)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 17-2006. (Perry, Amanda)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8839822) filed by ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Perry, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABDALLAH et al v ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED ABDALLAH
Represented By: Amanda Fox Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUSSEIN HABIB FARHAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHMAD KANAAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ALI SHOUMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOUAD ABBOUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASHIR MEHDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HUSSEIN HAZIMEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBRAHIM ABBOUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ISSAM MANSOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KASSEM AJEEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHMOUD YAKZAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMAD CHAMOUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED LABAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYED FAWAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUSSEIN FARHAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INFORMATION AND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?