SMARTMATIC USA CORP. et al v. HERRING NETWORKS, INC.
Plaintiff: SMARTMATIC USA CORP., SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V. and SGO CORPORATION LIMITED
Defendant: HERRING NETWORKS, INC. doing business as ONE AMERICA NEWS NETWORK
Case Number: 1:2021cv02900
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/18/2022. (zcal)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Defendants' #20 Motion for an Extension to Respond to the Complaint, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall Respond to the Complaint on or before February 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 22, 2021. (lccjn2)
December 20, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Move in Response to the Complaint and for Entry of an Extended Briefing Schedule by HERRING NETWORKS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimrey, Blaine)
December 20, 2021 Filing 19 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (Kimrey, Blaine)
December 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Keith McCalmon on behalf of HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (McCalmon, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Koechley on behalf of HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (Koechley, Julia)
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Ledebuhr on behalf of HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (Ledebuhr, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanah Park on behalf of HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (Park, Jeanah)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Clark on behalf of HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (Clark, Bryan)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine C. Kimrey on behalf of HERRING NETWORKS, INC. (Kimrey, Blaine)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE. HERRING NETWORKS, INC. waiver sent on 11/30/2021, answer due 1/29/2022. (Tortorella, Lauren)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Tortorella on behalf of SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP. (Tortorella, Lauren)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Wrigley on behalf of SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP. (Wrigley, Nicole)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Erik Connolly on behalf of SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP. (Connolly, Joel)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Erik Connolly, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that J. Erik Connolly is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 15, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole E. Wrigley, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Nicole E. Wrigley is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 15, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren C. Tortorella, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Lauren C. Tortorella is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 15, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren C. Tortorella, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8853082. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren C. Tortorella, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillingham, Emily)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicole E. Wrigley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8853050. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole E. Wrigley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillingham, Emily)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Erik Connolly, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8853016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Erik Connolly, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillingham, Emily)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 5, 2021. (lccjn2)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to HERRING NETWORKS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 4, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP. (Dillingham, Emily)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V., SMARTMATIC USA CORP.. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-2130. (Dillingham, Emily)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HERRING NETWORKS, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8841018) filed by SMARTMATIC USA CORP., SGO CORPORATION LIMITED, SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1A, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 2A, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 3A, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 4A, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 5A, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 6A, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 9A, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 10A, #20 Exhibit 11, #21 Exhibit 12, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 14A, #25 Exhibit 15, #26 Exhibit 15A, #27 Exhibit 16, #28 Exhibit 16A, #29 Exhibit 17, #30 Exhibit 17A, #31 Exhibit 18, #32 Exhibit 18A, #33 Exhibit 19, #34 Exhibit 19A, #35 Exhibit 20, #36 Exhibit 20A, #37 Exhibit 21, #38 Exhibit 22, #39 Exhibit 23, #40 Exhibit 24, #41 Exhibit 25, #42 Exhibit 25A, #43 Exhibit 26, #44 Exhibit 26A, #45 Exhibit 27, #46 Exhibit 27A, #47 Exhibit 28, #48 Exhibit 28A, #49 Exhibit 29, #50 Exhibit 29A, #51 Exhibit 30, #52 Exhibit 31, #53 Exhibit 32, #54 Exhibit 33, #55 Exhibit 33A, #56 Exhibit 34, #57 Exhibit 34A, #58 Exhibit 35, #59 Exhibit 35A, #60 Exhibit 36, #61 Exhibit 36A, #62 Exhibit 37, #63 Exhibit 37A, #64 Exhibit 38, #65 Exhibit 38A, #66 Exhibit 39, #67 Exhibit 39A, #68 Exhibit 40, #69 Exhibit 41, #70 Exhibit 41A, #71 Exhibit 42, #72 Exhibit 43, #73 Exhibit 44, #74 Exhibit 45, #75 Exhibit 45A, #76 Exhibit 46, #77 Exhibit 47, #78 Exhibit 48, #79 Exhibit 49, #80 Exhibit 50, #81 Exhibit 51, #82 Exhibit 52, #83 Exhibit 53, #84 Exhibit 54, #85 Exhibit 55, #86 Exhibit 56, #87 Exhibit 57, #88 Exhibit 58, #89 Exhibit 59, #90 Exhibit 60, #91 Exhibit 61, #92 Exhibit 62, #93 Exhibit 63, #94 Exhibit 64, #95 Exhibit 65, #96 Exhibit 66, #97 Exhibit 67, #98 Exhibit 68, #99 Exhibit 69, #100 Exhibit 70, #101 Exhibit 71, #102 Exhibit 72, #103 Exhibit 73, #104 Exhibit 74, #105 Exhibit 75, #106 Exhibit 76, #107 Exhibit 77, #108 Exhibit 78, #109 Exhibit 79, #110 Exhibit 80, #111 Exhibit 81, #112 Exhibit 82, #113 Exhibit 83, #114 Exhibit 84, #115 Exhibit 85, #116 Exhibit 86, #117 Exhibit 87, #118 Exhibit 88, #119 Exhibit 89, #120 Exhibit 90, #121 Exhibit 91, #122 Exhibit 92, #123 Exhibit 93, #124 Exhibit 94, #125 Exhibit 95, #126 Exhibit 96, #127 Exhibit 97, #128 Exhibit 98, #129 Exhibit 99, #130 Exhibit 100, #131 Exhibit 101, #132 Exhibit 102, #133 Exhibit 103, #134 Exhibit 104, #135 Exhibit 105, #136 Exhibit 106, #137 Exhibit 107, #138 Exhibit 108, #139 Exhibit 109, #140 Exhibit 110, #141 Exhibit 111, #142 Exhibit 112, #143 Exhibit 113, #144 Exhibit 114, #145 Exhibit 115, #146 Exhibit 116, #147 Exhibit 117, #148 Exhibit 118, #149 Exhibit 119, #150 Exhibit 120, #151 Exhibit 121, #152 Exhibit 122, #153 Exhibit 123, #154 Exhibit 124, #155 Exhibit 125, #156 Exhibit 126, #157 Exhibit 127, #158 Exhibit 128, #159 Exhibit 129, #160 Exhibit 130, #161 Exhibit 131, #162 Exhibit 132, #163 Exhibit 133, #164 Exhibit 134, #165 Exhibit 135, #166 Exhibit 136, #167 Exhibit 137, #168 Exhibit 138, #169 Exhibit 139, #170 Exhibit 140, #171 Exhibit 141, #172 Exhibit 142, #173 Exhibit 143, #174 Exhibit 144, #175 Exhibit 145, #176 Exhibit 146, #177 Exhibit 147, #178 Exhibit 148, #179 Exhibit 149, #180 Exhibit 150, #181 Exhibit 151, #182 Exhibit 152, #183 Exhibit 153, #184 Exhibit 154, #185 Exhibit 155, #186 Exhibit 156, #187 Exhibit 157, #188 Exhibit 158, #189 Civil Cover Sheet, #190 Summons)(Dillingham, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMARTMATIC USA CORP. et al v. HERRING NETWORKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMARTMATIC USA CORP.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Nicole Wrigley
Represented By: Lauren Tortorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMARTMATIC INTERNATIONAL HOLDING B.V.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Nicole Wrigley
Represented By: Lauren Tortorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGO CORPORATION LIMITED
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Nicole Wrigley
Represented By: Lauren Tortorella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERRING NETWORKS, INC. doing business as ONE AMERICA NEWS NETWORK
Represented By: Blaine C. Kimrey
Represented By: Bryan Clark
Represented By: Brian Ledebuhr
Represented By: Brian Keith McCalmon
Represented By: Jeanah Park
Represented By: Julia Koechley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?