TOVAR v. CALLISONRTKL INC.
Plaintiff: GLORIA TOVAR
Defendant: CALLISONRTKL INC and CALLISONRTKL INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02975
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022; Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2022; Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) and Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 2/1/2022; Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/2/22; Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 6/16/2022; Reply due by 6/30/22; Discovery due by 9/2/2022; Status Conference set for 9/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Rudolph Contreras via zoom video. (tj)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nigel Munroe Atwell on behalf of GLORIA TOVAR (Atwell, Nigel)
December 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/19/2021. (lcrc3)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Bergeson, Meredith)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report in accordance with Local Civil Rule 16.3 on or before December 16, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/2/2021. (lcrc3)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CALLISONRTKL INC..(Bergeson, Meredith)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 Receipt on 11/24/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 003832 B. (zjf)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Notice to Counsel/Party Sent to Yaida O. Ford;. (zsb)
November 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/1/2021, (hs)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CALLISONRTKL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bergeson, Meredith)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Renee Fleming Bergeson on behalf of CALLISONRTKL INC. (Bergeson, Meredith)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/15/2021. (lcrc3)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
November 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmg)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 003832 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8858642 filed by CALLISONRTKL INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Remy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOVAR v. CALLISONRTKL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA TOVAR
Represented By: Yaida O. Ford
Represented By: Nigel Munroe Atwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALLISONRTKL INC
Represented By: John Michael Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALLISONRTKL INC.
Represented By: John Michael Remy
Represented By: Meredith Renee Fleming Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?