ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Plaintiff: ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Case Number: 1:2021cv02997
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colsia, Jessica)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 1/10/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/22/2021. (lccrc2)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS.(Colsia, Jessica)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica B. Colsia on behalf of UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Colsia, Jessica)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC re #1 Complaint, . (Carpenter, Sarah) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/17/2021) (znmw).
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC re #1 Complaint, . (Carpenter, Sarah) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/17/2021) (znmw).
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC (Carpenter, Sarah)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8862196) filed by ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Carpenter, Sarah) (Attachment 5 replaced on 11/12/2021) (adh, ).
November 12, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECC INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: Sarah Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Jessica B. Colsia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?