FRETZ v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA LAUREN FRETZ
Defendant: JOE BIDEN, KAMALA HARRIS, ANTHONY FAUCI and MARK A. MILLEY
Case Number: 1:2021cv03053
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by ANGELA LAUREN FRETZ (znmg)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the #2 application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/22/2021. (ztnr)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/22/2021. (ztnr)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANGELA LAUREN FRETZ. (znmw)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOE BIDEN, ANTHONY FAUCI, KAMALA HARRIS, MARK A. MILLEY filed by ANGELA LAUREN FRETZ. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(znmw)
November 17, 2021 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/17/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRETZ v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA LAUREN FRETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMALA HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY FAUCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK A. MILLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?