CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03054
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Parker on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Parker, Lauren)
December 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/3/2022. (kt)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's #9 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant seeks a thirty-day extension, to February 3, 2022, to answer Plaintiff's complaint. The #9 Motion states that "[u]ndersigned counsel was recently assigned to this matter... and will be out of the office from December 23, 2021 to January 3, 2022. In order to prepare an appropriate response[,]... [the] undersigned needs additional time to confer with agency counsel." Plaintiff does not oppose the motion, and this is Defendant's first such request. Accordingly, and upon good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's #9 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 27, 2021. (lcckk1)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE. (McBride, Patricia)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Crystal, Howard)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/23/2021. (DM)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/19/21. (lcckk1)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 ERRATA Corrected Declaration of Lauren A. Parker by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren A. Parker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8875193. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Crystal, Howard)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren A. Parker, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8875193. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Declaraton of Lauren Parker, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crystal, Howard)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Crystal, Howard)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8875021) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to USDA, #3 Summons Summons to US Atty, #4 Summons Summons to USAG)(Crystal, Howard)
November 18, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to hcrystal@biologicaldiversity.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The Declaration is missing an original signature. Please file the signed document (Declaration) using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
November 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Howard M. Crystal
Represented By: Lauren Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE RURAL UTILITIES SERVICE
Represented By: Patricia K. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?