WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT et al v. VILSACK et al
Plaintiff: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD and WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Defendant: THOMAS J. VILSACK and UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03056
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer R. Schwartz on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Schwartz, Jennifer)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint motion to modify #13 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the motion is GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS that (1) Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer #12 on or before January 21, 2022; (2) Defendants shall file a reply on or before January 28, 2022; (3) Defendants shall file an answer, if necessary, on or before March 29, 2022; and (4) Defendants shall file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record, if necessary, on or before April 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2021. (lcrdm2)
December 19, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' motion to transfer venue [ECF No. 12] and for sixty-day extension of early case deadlines by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Norman, Erika)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - A. Laybolt Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Final Environmental Impact Statement (without appendices), #3 Exhibit C - Record of Decision, #4 Proposed Order)(Norway, Robert)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #2 Notice of Related Case - Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Cases filed by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Norway, Robert)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE served on 11/29/2021; THOMAS J. VILSACK served on 11/29/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/29/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2022.) (See Docket Entry #9 to view document). (znmw)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney General, and Defendants Thomas Vilsack and U.S. Forest Service. (Persell, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mark Norway on behalf of UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, THOMAS J. VILSACK (Norway, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika D. Norman on behalf of UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, THOMAS J. VILSACK (Norman, Erika)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Persell, John)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/20/2021. (lcrdm2)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Sandler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sandler, Matthew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, THOMAS J. VILSACK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-2864. (zsb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8875154) filed by WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Related Case Form)(Persell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT et al v. VILSACK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Represented By: John S. Persell
Represented By: Matthew Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD
Represented By: John S. Persell
Represented By: Matthew Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: John S. Persell
Represented By: Jennifer R. Schwartz
Represented By: Matthew Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. VILSACK
Represented By: Erika D. Norman
Represented By: Robert Mark Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Represented By: Erika D. Norman
Represented By: Robert Mark Norway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?