CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN et al v. REGAN et al
Plaintiff: CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: MICHAEL REGAN and ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2021cv03063
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Referring Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Cases Consolidated. Cases 21-3063 has been consolidated with case 20-3119, pursuant to an Order entered 3/31/2022. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Civil Action No. 20-3119. The parties are advised NOT to elect the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (zeg)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #17 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases, Joint Motion to Hold in Abeyance. It is hereby ORDERED that Case No. 20-cv-03119 and Case No. 21-cv-03063 are consolidated. The Clerk's Office shall close Case No. 21-cv-03063 and transfer those parties to No. 20-cv-03119 if necessary; all filings shall be made only in No. 20-cv-03119 and parties shall NOT elect to spread text when filing on ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing. Case No. 21-cv-03063 shall be held in abeyance; Defendant's April 5, 2022, response deadline is VACATED. The parties in No. 21-cv-03063 shall join the parties in No. 20-cv-03119 in filing a joint status report upon the settlement of these matters or on May 10, 2022, whichever is earlier. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/31/2022. (lctnm3)
March 30, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL REGAN filed by CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN, SIERRA CLUB, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK.(zeg)
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases (CCSJ, et al. v. Regan and EIP, et al. v. Regan, 1:20-cv-3119), Joint MOTION to Hold in Abeyance the CCSJ, et al. v. Regan Matter, Subject to the Same Status Report Deadlines as the EIP, et al. v. Regan Matter by MICHAEL REGAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimball, Kimere)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #16 Motion to Amend. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the Plaintiffs' [16-1] Amended Complaint. The Defendants' responsive pleading remains due on or before April 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/30/2022. (lctnm1)
March 29, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint Redline, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheuse, Emma)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/7/22. (lctnm3)
March 4, 2022 Filing 14 Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden as related. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK, SIERRA CLUB. Case related to Case No. 20-3119. (Cheuse, Emma)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, it is ORDERED the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before April 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 25, 2022. (lccjn1)
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL REGAN served on 12/3/2021 (Tumeh, Deena)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/6/2021. (Tumeh, Deena)
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/6/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2022. (Tumeh, Deena)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF 1) by MICHAEL REGAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimball, Kimere)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimere Kimball on behalf of MICHAEL REGAN (Kimball, Kimere)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Deena Tumeh on behalf of CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK, SIERRA CLUB (Tumeh, Deena)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 13, 2021. (lccjn1)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL REGAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 19, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Cheuse, Emma)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK (Cheuse, Emma)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN (Cheuse, Emma)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants , Michael Regan, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, in his official capacity ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8875929) filed by CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN, SIERRA CLUB, LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Garland, #3 Summons Graves, #4 Summons Regan)(Cheuse, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN et al v. REGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONCERNED CITIZENS OF ST. JOHN
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Deena Tumeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISIANA ENVIRONMENTAL ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Deena Tumeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Emma C. Cheuse
Represented By: Deena Tumeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL REGAN
Represented By: Kimere Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?